EP2754544 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYPROPYLENE MICRO-POROUS FOAMED THICK BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microcell Technology Co., Ltd. JI Zhengrong Jingang Road Bali Industrial Park, Bali Town Economic Development Zone Yangzhou, Jiangsu 225131 / CN | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Zhengrong c/o Microcell Technology Co., Ltd. Jingang Road, Bali Industrial Park, Bali Town Economic Development Zone Yangzhou, Jiangsu 225131 / CN | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Archer, Graham John Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12875716.8 | 13.11.2012 | [2016/42] | WO2012CN84503 | Priority number, date | CN201210443118 | 08.11.2012 Original published format: CN201210443118 | [2014/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014071641 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2754544 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2754544 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/04, B29C44/34, // C08J9/12 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B29C44/04 (EP,US);
E04C2/30 (US);
B29C44/3453 (EP,US);
B29C44/348 (EP,US);
C08J9/122 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/041 (EP,US);
B29L2007/002 (EP,US);
C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2201/032 (EP,US);
C08J2203/06 (EP,US);
C08J2203/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/29] | B29C44/02, B29C44/34, C08J9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DICKEN, MIKROPORÖSEN UND GESCHÄUMTEN POLYPROPYLENPLATTE | [2014/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYPROPYLENE MICRO-POROUS FOAMED THICK BOARD | [2014/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN PANNEAU ÉPAIS DE POLYPROPYLÈNE MICROPOREUX EN MOUSSE | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2013 | Translation filed | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 23.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2012 | AL | 19.10.2016 | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | IE | 13.11.2016 | MT | 13.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
TR | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
MT | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
MT | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
IE | 13.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1061702 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 42; figure - *; | [X]US2003082346 (WU PHILLIP C L [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0030] , [0031] - paragraph [0031]; figure - *; | [A]US2004080070 (LIU HSIN-CHU [TW], et al) [A] 5-7* claim - * | International search | [A]WO2008148918 (ULMA C Y E S COOP [ES], et al); | [A]CN101343927 (PEIJUN JIN [CN]); | [A]CN101654946 (SHAOJUN GUO); | [A]CN101722640 (JIANCHUN XU); | [A]CN101948585 (JSP CORP); | [X]CN102167840 (XIULEI JIANG); | [A]CN202225413U (SINO RUBBER MACHINERY CO LTD); | [X] - LI, ZUDE, HANDBOOK OF PLASTIC PROCESS, (199710), page 396, 397, XP008173295 |