EP2845103 - BLOCK LEVEL STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUEN, Chun-Hui 450 Alexandra Road Singapore 119960 / SG | 02 /
KIRCHBERG, Markus 450 Alexandra Road Singapore 119960 / SG | 03 /
LEE, Bu Sung 450 Alexandra Road Singapore 119960 / SG | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12875780.4 | 30.04.2012 | WO2012US35908 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013165382 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845103 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00, G06F12/02, G06F3/06 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
G06F3/065 (EP,US);
G06F3/0604 (EP,US);
G06F3/0611 (EP,US);
G06F3/0617 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F3/0647 (EP,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | G06F12/00, G06F12/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | SPEICHERUNG AUF BLOCKEBENE | [2015/11] | English: | BLOCK LEVEL STORAGE | [2015/11] | French: | STOCKAGE DE NIVEAU BLOC | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 19.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011208938 (CARR DAVID JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * figures 1-2 * * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 3 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 3-7,13; | [Y]US2005257082 (ZOHAR OFIR [IL], et al) [Y] 8,9 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0070] * | International search | [X]US2008243773 (PATEL SUJAL M [US], et al); | [A]US5485475 (TAKAGI SHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2010169568 (NAKAMURA TAKAKI [JP]); | [A]US2012084519 (VIJAYAN MANOJ KUMAR [US], et al) |