EP2845354 - INTELLIGENT SUPERVISION FOR CONFIGURATION OF PRECISION TIME PROTOCOL (PTP) ENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Qingfeng 916-5311 Rue Sherbrooke Quest Montreal, Quebec H4A 1V3 / CA | 02 /
CUI, Baifeng China Digital Kingdom Building CDK 2F No.1 North Road Wang Jing Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12875866.1 | 03.05.2012 | WO2012CN75019 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163803 | Date: | 07.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845354 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/70, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04J3/06 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04L69/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1095 (US);
H04J3/0667 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | H04L12/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE ÜBERWACHUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION VON PTP-EINHEITEN | [2015/11] | English: | INTELLIGENT SUPERVISION FOR CONFIGURATION OF PRECISION TIME PROTOCOL (PTP) ENTITIES | [2015/11] | French: | SUPERVISION INTELLIGENTE POUR LA CONFIGURATION D'ENTITÉS À PROTOCOLE DE TEMPS DE PRÉCISION (PTP) | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 09.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2073403 (THALES ALENIA SPACE ITALIA S P [IT]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1A,2; claims 1-10 * [I] 4,5,10; | [A]WO2011060965 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3 ** page 13 - page 29; figures 1-4; claims 1-16 * | International search | [A]US2006059270 (PLEASANT DANIEL L [US], et al); | [A]CN101465707 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101882990 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN101977104 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) |