EP2850555 - METHOD IN A PROCESSOR, AN APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÄHTEENMÄKI, Mika Paavo Kolin katu 1 A 1 FI-33720 Tampere / FI | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/48] |
Former [2015/13] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12876700.1 | 16.05.2012 | [2022/48] | WO2012FI50472 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013171362 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2850555 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2850555 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/74, G06F9/48, G06F9/38, G06F9/50, G06F9/30, G06F21/62 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/74 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/5027 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/6209 (US);
G06F15/80 (US);
G06F21/71 (US);
G06F9/30145 (US);
H04L63/105 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | G06F21/74, G06F9/48, G06F9/38, G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IN EINEM PROZESSOR, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2015/13] | English: | METHOD IN A PROCESSOR, AN APPARATUS AND A COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2015/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ IMPLÉMENTÉ DANS UN PROCESSEUR, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2015/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | IE | 16.05.2023 | LU | 16.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 16.05.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 16.05.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5524247 (MIZUNO SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004046934 (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005081183 (ACCAPADI JOS MANUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005210472 (ACCAPADI JOS M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006212945 (DONLIN PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1865435 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009164399 (BELL JR ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - ARM LIMITED, "ARM Security Technology - Building a Secure System using TrustZone Technology", INTERNET CITATION, (20090430), pages I - XII,1, URL: http://infocenter.arm.com/help/topic/com.arm.doc.prd29-genc-009492c/PRD29-GENC-009492C_trustzone_security_whitepaper.pdf, (20110927), XP002660015 [I] 1-15 * pages 3-2 - pages 3-7 * * pages 3-13 - pages 3-14 * * pages 5-13 - pages 5-15 * * figures 3-4 * | International search | [A]US5524247 (MIZUNO SATOSHI [JP]); | [A]WO2004046934 (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]); | [A]US2005081183 (ACCAPADI JOS MANUEL [US], et al); | [A]US2005210472 (ACCAPADI JOS M [US], et al); | [A]US2006212945 (DONLIN PATRICK J [US], et al); | [A]EP1865435 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE [FR]); | [A]US2009164399 (BELL JR ROBERT H [US], et al); | [X] - ARM, "ARM Security Technology Building a Secure System using TrustZone Technology", (2009), pages 3 - 2, URL: http://infocenter.arm.com/help/index.jsp?topic=/com.arm.doc.prd29-genc-009492c/index.html, (20130701), XP002660015 | Examination | US2010333193 | US2012084777 | - SOARES LIVIO ET AL, "FlexSC: Flexible System Call Scheduling with Exception-Less System Calls", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH USENIX SYMPOSIUM ON OPERATING SYSTEMS DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION VANCOUVER, vol. 6, (20101004), pages 33 - 46, URL: https://www.usenix.org/legacy/event/osdi10/tech/full_papers/osdi10_proceedings.pdf, (20211025), XP055854609 | - XIANGYUN ZENG ET AL, "Research on the Embedded Heterogeneous Multi-core Design Method for 100GbE Network Processor", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, vol. 29, doi:10.1016/J.PROENG.2012.01.007, ISSN 1877-7058, (20120215), pages 579 - 583, (20120215), XP028457210 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2012.01.007 | - JASON AGRON ET AL, "Distributed Hardware-Based Microkernels: Making Heterogeneous OS Functionality a System Primitive", FIELD-PROGRAMMABLE CUSTOM COMPUTING MACHINES (FCCM), 2010 18TH IEEE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100502), ISBN 978-0-7695-4056-6, pages 39 - 46, XP031681964 | - ALEXANDRA FEDOROVA ET AL, "Maximizing power efficiency with asymmetric multicore systems", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, INC, UNITED STATES, (20091201), vol. 52, no. 12, doi:10.1145/1610252.1610270, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 48 - 57, XP058163215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1610252.1610270 |