EP2856890 - CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | ||
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTODAMARI, Tetsuya c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku 130-8603 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Yoshiaki c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku 130-8603 Tokyo / JP | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/28] |
Former [2015/15] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12877676.2 | 30.05.2012 | [2020/28] | WO2012JP63991 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013179429 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2856890 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2856890 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/04, A24D3/06 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A24D3/04 (EP,US);
A24D3/061 (EP,CN,KR);
A24D3/048 (EP,CN,US);
A24D1/002 (KR);
A24D3/0216 (KR);
A24D3/063 (KR);
A24D3/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIGARETTE | [2015/15] | English: | CIGARETTE | [2015/15] | French: | CIGARETTE | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | Translation filed | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 08.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2018 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Observations by third parties | 17.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20172337.6 / EP3704960 | EP20182859.7 / EP3735845 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2021
13.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2021
13.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2021/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2021
Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB | 20.04.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.08.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/13] | 20.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2012 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | IE | 30.05.2021 | LU | 30.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2021 | ||
LU | 30.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2021 | ||
LU | 30.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2021 | ||
LU | 30.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.05.2021 | ||
LU | 30.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0649607 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1,3-5,8-10* abstract *; | [XA]WO2006082529 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,12-15 * page 17, line 8 - page 18, line 18; figures 1-9 * [A] 16; | [A]JP2008546400 (V. MANE FILS [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2120616 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,12-15 * column 1, paragraphs [0003]-[0004]; figures 1,2,4 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 11 *; | [XA]EP2213185 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,12-15 * column 18, paragraph [0063] - column 19, paragraph [0064]; figure 10 * [A] 5,10,16; | [XA]JP2011512122 (R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO. [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,8,10,12-16 | International search | [A]JP3112468B (JAPAN TOBACCO INC.); | [A]JP2003304856 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO); | [A]JP2008546400 (V. MANE FILS); | [A]JP2010514437 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.); | [A]JP2011512122 (R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO.) | by applicant | JP2003304856 | Opposition | EP1561409 | CN1988515 | WO2007111907 | WO2008112066 | DE102007031372 | US2009306827 | DE102009059181 | WO2011037952 | WO2012018965 | AU2010330199 | WO2012174595 | EP2573247 | WO2014111204 | EP2805653 | EP2805653 | US5186185 | WO2008084333 | - Anonymous, "Bus (computing", Wikipedia, (20170301), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130430021255/https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Bus_(computing, XP055796808 |