EP2857855 - CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL APPARATUS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5 Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA, Yasuo c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-207 / JP | 02 /
IWASAKI, Toshiya c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-207 / JP | 03 /
OUE, Yasuhiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-207 / JP | 04 /
IKEBE, Hayato c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-207 / JP | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12877987.3 | 31.05.2012 | WO2012JP03605 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013179350 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2857855 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,US);
G01R31/3646 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN UND STEUERVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2022/13] | English: | CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL APPARATUS USING SAME | [2015/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE ET APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE L'UTILISANT | [2015/15] |
Former [2015/15] | STEUERVERFAHREN UND STEUERVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2014 | Translation filed | 30.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 07.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1246336 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0013] * * claim 6 *; | [XI]EP2068161 (HUANG YUNG-CHEN [TW], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 2,7,8 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0015] - [0042] , [0061] , [0080] , [0126] , [0127] * [I] 2-8; | [A]US2010256935 (IMANISHI TSURAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0014] , [0 82] - paragraph [0084] * | International search | [A]JP2004022183 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2004271532 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JP2007187533 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | JP2005321983 |