EP2775399 - RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD OF VIRTUAL MACHINE SYSTEM, VIRTUAL MACHINE SYSTEM, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Feng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Messerschmittstrasse 4 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12878206.7 | 26.12.2012 | WO2012CN87558 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101010 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775399 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/455 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP,US);
G06F9/455 (US);
G06F9/5011 (US);
G06F9/5083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSMITTELVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN EINES VIRTUELLEN MASCHINENSYSTEMS, VIRTUELLES MASCHINENSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2014/37] | English: | RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD OF VIRTUAL MACHINE SYSTEM, VIRTUAL MACHINE SYSTEM, AND APPARATUS | [2014/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES DE SYSTÈME DE MACHINE VIRTUELLE, SYSTÈME DE MACHINE VIRTUELLE ET APPAREIL | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2013 | Translation filed | 06.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 01.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/33] | 28.03.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010281482 (PIKE ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010332658 (ELYASHEV VITALY [IL]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011213686 (FERRIS JAMES MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [I]US2011258621 (KERN ERIC R [US]) [I] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012089726 (DODDAVULA SHYAM KUMAR [IN]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012160124 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [E]US2014115586 (HONG KAIXING [CN]) [E] 1-22* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101719082 (INST COMPUTING TECH CN ACADEMY); | [A]CN102307224 (HUAWEI SOFTWARE TECHNOLOGY CO); | [X]CN102317917 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102419718 (INSPUR BEIJING ELECT INF IND) |