EP2838966 - AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West 7th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | [2016/39] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West 7th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Tao Room 102-302 Lane 3151 Yindu Rd Shanghai 201108 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Junyu c/o Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | 03 /
WANG, Tao 184 MT Pleasant Road Highton, Victoria 3216 / AU | 04 /
WANG, Yujiang No.302 Bldg 173 Lane 99 Laiting Bei Road Shanghai 201615 / CN | 05 /
CUI, Longlan Room 102 No 58 Ming Yue Road 199 Nong Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2015/23] |
Former [2015/09] | 01 /
WANG, Tao Room 102-302 Lane 3151 Yindu Rd Shanghai 201108 / CN | ||
02 /
CHEN, Junyu Room 11-502 Lane 286 Yijiang Rd Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Tao 184 MT Pleasant Road Highton, Victoria 3216 / AU | |||
04 /
WANG, Yujiang No.302 Bldg 173 Lane 99 Laiting Bei Road Shanghai 201615 / CN | |||
05 /
CUI, Longlan Room 102 No 58 Ming Yue Road 199 Nong Shanghai 200135 / CN | Representative(s) | McLean, Craig Sutherland Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2016/39] |
Former [2015/09] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12878426.1 | 05.06.2012 | [2016/39] | WO2012CN76475 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013181793 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838966 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838966 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09D151/10, C09D151/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
C09D151/003 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09D133/14 (CN,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (CN,US);
C08K3/36 (CN,KR,US);
C08K9/10 (CN);
C09D125/14 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT | [2015/09] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED STABILITY | [2015/09] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT AQUEUSE À STABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 14.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2012 | AL | 28.09.2016 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 05.06.2017 | LU | 05.06.2017 | MT | 05.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 05.06.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
MT | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 05.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006009546 (BROWN WARD T [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] ** abstract *; | [X]US2008071011 (LAMERS PAUL H [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064] * * abstract *; | [X]US2008233062 (KRISHNAN VENKATARAM [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0165] * * paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0180] * * abstract *; | [X]WO2010125024 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 30 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 32 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 4 * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 10 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2010151865 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 5 - line 19 * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 21 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2011009875 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 24 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 25 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 31 * * abstract * | International search | [Y]CN1468289 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]CN1922277 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]CN101861366 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO); | [X]CN102414232 (BASF SE) |