EP2863297 - TERMINAL AND INTERFACE OPERATION MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yulong Computer Telecommunication Technologies (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. No.2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lanbo No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12879211.6 | 18.06.2012 | WO2012CN77090 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013189014 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863297 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (KR,US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
H04M1/72469 (KR);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04806 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SCHNITTSTELLENBETRIEB | [2015/17] | English: | TERMINAL AND INTERFACE OPERATION MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2015/17] | French: | TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'EXPLOITATION D'INTERFACE | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | Translation filed | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 15.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2008027183 (SHARP KK) [Y] 4,12 * automatic translation JP2006198904 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 98]; figures 14A, 14B, 14C *; | [Y]US2009295743 (NAKAJOH FUMIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 42] , [0 43] , [0 44] , [0 63] , [0 64]; figures 3A, 4A, 4B, 7, 10 *; | [Y]JP2011086036 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [Y] 5-8,13-15 * automatic translation JP2009237063 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 36] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0047]; figures 4a, 4e * * paragraph [0066]; figures 7a, 7b, 7c, 7d * * paragraphs [0072] , [0 75]; figures 8a, 8b, 8c ** paragraphs [0078] , [ 118] - [0126]; figures 17a, 17b *; | [Y]US2011304584 (HWANG SUNG JAE [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 50] , [0 62] , [0 65] , [0 68] , [0 93]; figures 4A, 4B, 8 * | International search | [Y]CN101119431 (HUANDA COMP SHANGHAI CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101996044 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]CN102034457 (BEIJING HUAQI INF DIGITAL SCI); | [A]CN102084327 (SONY CORP); | [A]CN202275356U (SHANGHAI HUAQIN TELECOM TECH) |