EP2879009 - MOVING BODY AND MOVING BODY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASE, Yoshiyasu c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1 Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/23] | Application number, filing date | 12880022.4 | 29.06.2012 | WO2012JP66785 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014002275 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879009 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B25J5/00, B62D57/02 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
B62D37/04 (EP,US);
B62D57/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHER KÖRPER UND SYSTEM MIT BEWEGLICHEM KÖRPER | [2015/23] | English: | MOVING BODY AND MOVING BODY SYSTEM | [2015/23] | French: | CORPS MOBILE ET SYSTÈME DE CORPS MOBILE | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2014 | Translation filed | 11.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 18.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004001705 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2011134184 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2003205480 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) | by applicant | JP2003205480 |