EP2868140 - METHOD AND RELAY NODE FOR IMPLEMENTING MULTIPLE WIRELESS BACKHAULS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jinhua Room 5-201 Building 113 Nanhuzhongyuan Yiqu Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Rui No 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
GU, Xinyu Room 2-1309 Shuiqingmuhua Garden Zhongguancun North 2nd Street Haidian District Beijing 100044 / CN | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12880143.8 | 29.06.2012 | WO2012CN00895 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014000128 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868140 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/34 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H04B7/155 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/15557 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W28/0215 (US);
H04W28/082 (US);
H04W40/22 (EP,CN,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND RELAISKNOTEN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG MEHRERER DRAHTLOSER BACKHAULS | [2015/19] | English: | METHOD AND RELAY NODE FOR IMPLEMENTING MULTIPLE WIRELESS BACKHAULS | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET NOEUD RELAIS POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE RACCORDEMENTS SANS FIL MULTIPLES | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 12.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.01.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN101505306 (FIBERHOME TELECOMM TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101742554 (UNIV NANJING POSTS & TELECOMM); | [X]WO2010112853 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al); | [X]US7961626 (REEVE ANDREW [GB]) |