EP2769730 - TREATMENT METHOD FOR DISSOLVING TUMOUR AND TRANSFORMING CANCER CELLS WITH PHENOL AND QUINONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huaibei Fenkun Health Consultancy Services Co., Ltd. 104 Qingshanquan Street Qingshanquan Town Jiawang District Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221000 / CN | For all designated states Zhao, Sihai 104, Qingshanquan Street Qingshanquan Town, Jiawang District Xuzhou Jiangsu 221000 / CN | [2014/49] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Huaibei Fenkun Health Consultancy Services Co., Ltd. 104 Qingshanquan Street Qingshanquan Town Jiawang District Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Sihai 104 Qingshanquan Street Qingshanquan Town Jiawang District Xuzhou Jiangsu 221000 / CN | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12881040.5 | 12.09.2012 | WO2012CN81271 | Priority number, date | CN20121240554 | 12.07.2012 Original published format: CN201210240554 | [2014/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014008708 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769730 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/8998, A61K36/9068, A23L1/29, A61P35/00 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
A61M3/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K36/28 (EP,US);
A61K36/282 (EP,US);
A61K36/899 (EP,US);
A61K36/8998 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/282, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/8998, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/899, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TUMORAUFLÖSUNG UND UMWANDLUNG VON KREBSZELLEN MIT PHENOL UND CHINON | [2014/35] | English: | TREATMENT METHOD FOR DISSOLVING TUMOUR AND TRANSFORMING CANCER CELLS WITH PHENOL AND QUINONE | [2014/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DESTINÉ À LA DISSOLUTION D'UNE TUMEUR ET À LA TRANSFORMATION DE CELLULES CANCÉREUSES AU MOYEN DE PHÉNOL ET DE QUINONE | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2014 | Translation filed | 22.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 21.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010209388 (MAZZIO ELIZABETH ANNE [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * the whole document *; | [Y] - FORGIONNE GUISSEPPI A, "Bovine cartilage, coenzyme Q10, and wheat grass therapy for primary peritoneal cancer.", JOURNAL OF ALTERNATIVE AND COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE (NEW YORK, N.Y.) FEB 2005, (200502), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 1075-5535, pages 161 - 165, XP002740700 [Y] 2-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/acm.2005.11.161 | [A] - HSU CHUNG-HUA ET AL, "The Relationship between Qi Deficiency, Cancer-related Fatigue and Quality of Life in Cancer Patients.", JOURNAL OF TRADITIONAL AND COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE APR 2012, (201204), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 2225-4110, pages 129 - 135, XP002740701 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S2225-4110(16)30086-4 | [Y] - KANG KYUNGSU ET AL, "Youngia denticulata Protects Against Oxidative Damage Induced by tert-Butylhydroperoxide in HepG2 Cells", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL FOOD, (201110), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 1198 - 1207, XP002740702 [Y] 2-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/jmf.2010.1557 | [Y] - YUAN SHU-LAN ET AL, "[Anticancer effect of tanshinone and its mechanisms].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200312), Database accession no. NLM14693071, XP002740703 [Y] 2-5 * abstract * | [ ] - AI ZHENG = AIZHENG = CHINESE JOURNAL OF CANCER DEC 2003, (200312), vol. 22, no. 12, pages 1363 - 1366 | International search | [A]CN1197651 (CAI JIANMEI [CN]); | [A]EP1702613 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]CN101133785 (UNIV YANTAI [CN]); | [A]WO2010090498 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al); | [A]CN101828700 (GU ZHANGLONG) |