EP2888095 - A REINFORCED STRUCTURE AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A REINFORCED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANKÄLL, Tommy Örngatan 8 S-590 29 Borensberg / SE | 02 /
GUSTAVSSON, Stefan Tuna Skogstorp S-585 91 Linköping / SE | 03 /
HALLANDER, Per Fanjunkaregatan 29 S-582 16 Linköping / SE | 04 /
LUNDBERG, Anders Storhagsgatan 37 S-590 49 Vikingstad / SE | 05 /
PETERSSON, Mikael Ullstämmavägen 122 S-589 51 Linköping / SE | 06 /
WEIDMANN, Björn Vråkgatan 4 S-590 31 Borensberg / SE | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12883107.0 | 21.08.2012 | [2020/40] | WO2012SE50890 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014031043 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888095 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2888095 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/08, B29C70/30, B29D99/00, B64C3/18, B29C70/34, // B64C1/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B29C70/342 (EP);
B29D99/0007 (EP);
B29D99/0014 (EP);
B64C2001/0072 (EP);
Y02T50/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | B29C70/08, B29C70/30, B29D99/00, B64C3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERSTÄRKTEN STRUKTUR | [2015/27] | English: | A REINFORCED STRUCTURE AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A REINFORCED STRUCTURE | [2015/27] | French: | STRUCTURE RENFORCÉE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE RENFORCÉE | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 24.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2020 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2012 | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.08.2012 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1800841 (SAAB AB [SE]) [AD] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0033]; figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]EP2295228 (ALENIA AERONAUTICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0019]; figures 2,3,8 * | International search | [A]US6520706 (MCKAGUE JR ELBERT LEE [US], et al); | [A]US2006172636 (BECH ANTON [DK]); | [A]US2007138695 (KROGAGER MAX [SE], et al); | [A]EP1967354 (JAMCO CORP [JP]); | [A]US2009176066 (DARROW DONALD C [US], et al); | [A]US2010285265 (SHINODA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012076989 (BLAND JAMEL R [US]); | [A]US2012100343 (BORGHINI-LILLI MATTEO [DE], et al) |