EP2891069 - HIGH PERFORMANCE PERSISTENT MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Sheng 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 02 /
YOON, Doe Hyun 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 03 /
JOUPPI, Norman Paul 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Vincent Louis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2015/28] | Application number, filing date | 12883648.3 | 28.08.2012 | WO2012US52684 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014035377 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891069 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/14, G11C16/06, G06F11/14, G06F3/06, G06F12/08 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G11C16/06 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/1471 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F12/0891 (US);
G06F3/0652 (US);
G06F3/0656 (US);
G06F3/0679 (US);
G06F2212/1032 (US);
G06F2212/202 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | G06F13/14, G11C16/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGER PERSISTENTER SPEICHER | [2015/28] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE PERSISTENT MEMORY | [2015/28] | French: | MÉMOIRE PERSISTANCE HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 09.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002147890 (SAULSBURY ASHLEY N [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2006227585 (TOMODA MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,10,11,13,15 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 3,4,6,8,9,12,14; | [A]US2011113208 (JOUPPI NORMAN PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5682517 (D ANDREA THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US2008059834 (ERSTAD DAVID O [US]); | [A]US7516267 (COULSON RICHARD L [US], et al); | [X]US2011113208 (JOUPPI NORMAN PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US2011276827 (ROYER JR ROBERT J [US], et al) |