EP2890775 - LAUNDRY DETERGENTS AND CLEANING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CARBOXYL GROUP-CONTAINING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaoli Long Teng 5 15-2-401 Changping District Beijing 102208 / CN | 02 /
LOUGHNANE, Brian Joseph 5516 Lake Michigan Drive Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | 03 /
YONEDA, Atsuro 5-8 Nishiotabicho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8512 / JP | 04 /
HEMMI, Akiko 5-8 Nishiotabicho Suita-shi Osaka 564-8512 / JP | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Howard, Phillip Jan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [2015/28] | Application number, filing date | 12883728.3 | 31.08.2012 | WO2012CN80823 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014032269 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890775 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.03.2014 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C08F220/06, C08F220/04 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
C11D3/0036 (EP,US);
C11D3/42 (US);
C11D3/378 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M15/3566 (EP,US);
D06M16/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTEL- UND REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT CARBOXYLGRUPPENHALTIGEN POLYMEREN | [2015/28] | English: | LAUNDRY DETERGENTS AND CLEANING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CARBOXYL GROUP-CONTAINING POLYMERS | [2015/28] | French: | DÉTERGENTS TEXTILES ET COMPOSITIONS DE LAVAGE CONTENANT DES POLYMÈRES COMPRENANT DES GROUPES CARBOXYLE | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6395185 (GAUTHIER FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [I] 1-8,13,15-20* figure 2; example 3 *; | [XI]US2009305934 (CREAMER MARIANNE P [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,13,18,19 * claim - * * examples 5,7,8 * * Base Compositions #7 and #5; paragraph [0096] * * Polymer G * * paragraphs [0032] , [0050] , [0055] * [I] 6,8,15-17,20 | International search | [A]JP2002003536 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]WO2010024469 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012054827 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) |