EP2894092 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING BALLAST WATER WITH ULTRAVIOLET RAYS, HAVING SQUARE CROSS-SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasia Co., Ltd. 1559-3, Songjung-dong Gangseo-gu Busan 618-818 / KR | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Soo-Tae 102-1204 Oryukdo SK View Yongho 2-dong Nam-gu Busan 608-092 / KR | 02 /
PYO, Tae-Sung 22-19 Amnam-dong Seo-gu Busan 602-831 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Su-Kyu 104-503 Lucky Apt. Eomgung-dong Sasang-gu Busan 617-784 / KR | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 12883796.0 | 05.09.2012 | [2019/02] | WO2012KR07115 | Priority number, date | KR20120097377 | 03.09.2012 Original published format: KR 20120097377 | [2015/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014034987 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894092 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2894092 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B08B1/00, B63J4/00, C02F1/32 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (KR);
B08B1/00 (KR);
B08B1/30 (EP,US);
B63B11/00 (KR,US);
B63J4/002 (EP,US);
C02F2103/008 (EP,US);
C02F2201/3227 (EP,US);
C02F2201/324 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | B63B11/00, B08B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT QUADRATISCHEM QUERSCHNITT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BALLASTWASSER MIT UV-STRAHLUNG | [2015/29] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING BALLAST WATER WITH ULTRAVIOLET RAYS, HAVING SQUARE CROSS-SECTION | [2015/29] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRAITER L'EAU DE LEST AVEC DES RAYONS ULTRAVIOLETS, PRÉSENTANT UNE SECTION TRANSVERSALE CARRÉE | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2015 | Translation filed | 26.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 10.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2012 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | IE | 05.09.2019 | LU | 05.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.09.2012 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.09.2012 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 05.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 05.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008283467 (NGUYEN HAP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0133] - [0137]; figures 20, 21 *[I] 2-7 | International search | [Y]JP2001029941 (EBARA CORP); | [A]KR100505079B (WEDECO. CO., LTD); | [A]KR20090039305 (HANSUNG U V CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR100964403B (DAEJIN ENVIRONMENT INDUSTRY [KR]); | [Y]KR100994168B (NEOTEC UV LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2012125736 (PANASONIC CORP) |