EP2896172 - QOS-BASED COOPERATIVE SCHEDULING FOR HANDLING OF DATA TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOD, David 1066 Fife Ave Palo Alto 94301 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Zhen 6805 Wood Hollow Drive, Apt. 166 Austin, Texas 78731 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2015/30] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12884509.6 | 11.10.2012 | [2017/16] | WO2012SE51087 | Priority number, date | US201261701082P | 14.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261701082 P | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014042570 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896172 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896172 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/905, H04B10/27, H04L12/803, H04W40/12, H04W52/02, H04W88/06, H04L12/12 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04B10/25753 (US);
H04B10/27 (EP,US);
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
H04L43/0882 (EP,US);
H04W28/0236 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H04L12/905, H04B10/27, H04L12/803, H04W40/12, H04W52/02, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QOS-BASIERTES KOOPERATIVES SCHEDULING ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES DATENVERKEHRS | [2015/30] | English: | QOS-BASED COOPERATIVE SCHEDULING FOR HANDLING OF DATA TRAFFIC | [2015/30] | French: | PLANIFICATION COOPÉRATIVE À BASE DE QOS POUR GESTION DE TRAFIC DE DONNÉES | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 12.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2012 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | IE | 11.10.2017 | LU | 11.10.2017 | MT | 11.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 11.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 11.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
IE | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
LU | 11.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006221998 (LIVET CATHERINE [CA], et al) [I] 8,11,12,14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2010158525 (WALTER EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figure 5 *; | [A]US6763195 (WILLEBRAND HEINZ [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 30 - line 55; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US2006221998 (LIVET CATHERINE [CA], et al); | [X]WO2011150986 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO2012113841 (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al); | [A]WO2008036976 (PASSOVER INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1933477 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]); | [AP]WO2012128697 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | [A] - KANTARCI B ET AL., "TOWARDS ENERGY-EFFICIENT HYBRID FIBER-WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORKS", (20110626), pages 1 - 4, XP031911678 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTON.2011.5970786 | [A] - BURAK KANTARCI ET AL., "POWER SAVING CLUSTERS FOR ENERGY-EFFICIENT DESIGN OF FIBER-WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORKS", (20101219), XP031979308 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HONET.2010.5715748 | [A] - PULAK CHOWDHURY ET AL., "BUILDING A GREEN WIRELESS-OPTICAL BROADBAND ACCESS NETWORK (WOBAN)", (20100815), XP011304091 | by applicant | US2006221998 |