EP2896306 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMREE HI-TECH INC. P.O. Box 905, Quastisky Building Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Qiuming 3F-5F, Building A N. 16 Hechang West 3rd Road Zhongkai High-Tech Zone Huizhou, Guangdong 516000 / CN | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12884734.0 | 11.09.2012 | WO2012CN81233 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014040217 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896306 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, G02B27/18 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
G02B27/20 (EP,US);
A24F40/00 (EP,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,US);
A24F40/51 (EP,US);
A24F40/60 (EP,US);
G02B27/18 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2015/30] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE DEVICE THEREOF | [2015/30] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2015 | Translation filed | 13.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6024467 (LIU YUAN TSANG [TW]) [A] 6 * figure - *; | [A]US6431720 (CHENG DIDO [TW]) [A] 6 * figure - *; | [Y]US2005180808 (CUI JING E [CN]) [Y] 1-14 * figure - * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]CN2776695Y (ZHONG SHUIDA [CN]) [Y] 1-5,7-14 * figure - *; | [A]CN201207105Y (ZHONGSHAN XINXI PHOTOELECTRONI [CN]) [A] 1-14 * figure - *; | [A]US2010031968 (SHEIKH TARIQ [GB], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2010200008 (TAIEB ELI [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202172847U (BILL DANNY MARAN GOSS) [A] 1-14 * figure - *; | [Y]CN202233008U (JINFENG ZHU) [Y] 1-14 * figure - * | International search | [Y]CN2776695Y (ZHONG SHUIDA [CN]); | [A]CN201207105Y (ZHONGSHAN XINXI PHOTOELECTRONI [CN]); | [A]US2010031968 (SHEIKH TARIQ [GB], et al); | [A]US2010200008 (TAIEB ELI [US]); | [A]CN202172847U (BILL DANNY MARAN GOSS); | [Y]CN202233008U (JINFENG ZHU) |