EP2898567 - TUNABLE ANTENNA STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAI, Seng Chin 950 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 02 /
TAO, Yuan 25 Yun Qiao Road T22/29 Jinqiao Export Processing Zone Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric, et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Emde, Eric, et al Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12884865.2 | 24.09.2012 | WO2012US56940 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014046691 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898567 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00, H01Q5/392, H01Q5/335, H01Q5/328, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/42 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0442 (US);
H01Q1/24 (EP,US);
H01Q5/00 (EP,US);
H01Q5/328 (US);
H01Q5/335 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARE ANTENNENSTRUKTUR | [2015/31] | English: | TUNABLE ANTENNA STRUCTURE | [2015/31] | French: | BÂTI D'ANTENNE ACCORDABLE | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 15.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008088517 (ANSARI SAIED [US], et al) [A] 6,14 * figures 1 elements 104, 106 ** figure 2 element206 *; | [A]US2009224991 (ROWSON SEBASTIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2(a), 4(a) 5(a), 7 *; | [Y]US2011032165 (HENG CHEW CHWEE [SG], et al) [Y] 6,14 * abstract * * figure 9 * * paragraph [0044] *; | [XY]US2011057857 (NAGANO KENYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * abstract * * figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] * [Y] 6,14 | International search | [Y]US2005225488 (NAKAGAWA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008088517 (ANSARI SAIED [US], et al); | [A]US2010245201 (HOSSAIN GOLAM SORWAR [JP], et al); | [A]US2011260939 (KORVA HEIKKI [FI], et al); | [A]KR20120093911 (PULSE FINLAND OY [FI]) | by applicant | US2011032165 | US2011057857 |