EP2885488 - SUBSEA DUMMY RUN ELIMINATION ASSEMBLY AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINGGENBERG, Paul David 2118 Goliad Circle Frisco, Texas 75033 / US | 02 /
WAKABAYASHI, Dalmo Massaru 3900 Briargrove Lane 2110 Dallas, Texas 75287 / US | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 12884871.0 | 19.09.2012 | WO2012US56047 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014046651 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2885488 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
E21B33/06 (EP,US);
E21B47/09 (US);
E21B19/10 (EP,US);
E21B33/064 (US);
E21B34/045 (EP,US);
E21B47/001 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | UNTERSEE-DUMMY-LAUFELIMINIERUNGSANORDNUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2015/26] | English: | SUBSEA DUMMY RUN ELIMINATION ASSEMBLY AND RELATED METHOD | [2015/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUS-MARIN PERMETTANT D'ÉLIMINER LES ESSAIS À BLANC ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN UVRE | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 17.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/08] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4010804 (GARCIA JUAN A) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 40 - line 57; figure - *; | [I]US5372199 (CEGIELSKI EUGENE J [US], et al) [I] 13* column 3, line 1 - line 35; figure 2A *; | [XY]US2002189806 (DAVIDSON KENNETH C [US], et al) [X] 5,7,10-12 * paragraphs [0034] , [0049] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1,7 * [Y] 1-4,8,9; | [A]US2004047235 (KYLE DONALD G [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-12 * columns 20,21; figure - *; | [Y]CA2536451 (RAJIC MILAN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US2008110633 (TREWHELLA ROSS JOHN [US]) [A] 1-5,7-12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figure - *; | [Y]GB2481699 (WFS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [Y] 8,9 * page 2, line 8 - line 22 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 2; figure 1 *; | [I]US2012012341 (WHITE RICHARD [US], et al) [I] 13 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1-4 *; | [X] - Rober J Stomp ET AL, "SPE 90557 Deepwater DST Planning and Operations From a DP Vessel", (20040926), pages 1 - 19, URL: https://www.onepetro.org/download/conference-paper/SPE-90557-MS?id=conference-paper/SPE-90557-MS, (20160427), XP055268957 [X] 6 * page 7, column 2, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * | [I] - Dril Quip, "Dummy hanger and the second position casing hanger, casinng and seal assembly", (20110526), URL: http://www.mdl2179trialdocs.com/releases/release201303141200012/TREX-02793.pdf, (20170103), XP002765576 [I] 13,14 * pages 1,2; figure 1 * * page 19; figure 21 * | International search | [Y]US4010804 (GARCIA JUAN A); | [Y]US6758272 (BIXENMAN PATRICK W [US], et al); | [Y]US7301472 (KYLE DONALD G [US], et al); | [X]US2012197527 (MCKAY JAMES EDWIN [US], et al); | [Y]US8261837 (LEONARD JEROME T [US], et al) |