EP2899086 - SLIP RATIO ESTIMATION DEVICE AND SLIP RATIO ESTIMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | [2017/01] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1 Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Masahiro c/o Pioneer Corporation 1-1 Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 12884918.9 | 20.09.2012 | WO2012JP74022 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045365 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899086 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W40/068, B60T8/172, B60T8/1769 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B60W40/064 (EP,US);
B60L15/38 (US);
B60L3/102 (US);
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T8/1769 (EP,US);
B60W40/068 (EP,US);
B60T2210/12 (US);
B60W2520/28 (EP,US);
B60W2520/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | B60W40/068 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES SCHLUPFVERHÄLTNISSES UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES SCHLUPFVERHÄLTNISSES | [2015/31] | English: | SLIP RATIO ESTIMATION DEVICE AND SLIP RATIO ESTIMATION METHOD | [2015/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION DE COEFFICIENT DE PATINAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE COEFFICIENT DE PATINAGE | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2015 | Translation filed | 16.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 29.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10156823 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * figure 10 *; | [Y]DE19534265 (TOKICO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2012029783 (TAKENAKA TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2009184572 (YAMADA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2008029524 (UNIV YOKOHAMA NAT [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010051160 (NAT UNIV YOKOHAMA); | [A]JP2009142108 (NAT UNIV YOKOHAMA); | [A]JP2010209990 (YANMAR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006034012 | JP2007282406 | JP2008236914 | JP2010236883 | JP2010051160 |