EP2901509 - BLACK POLYIMIDE BATTERY LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Blvd. Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Bvld. Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yihua c/o Avery Dennison Corporation 150 N. Orange Grove Blvd. Pasadena, California 91103 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Jun c/o Avery Dennison Corporation 150 N. Orange Grove Blvd. Pasadena, California 91103 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, XinHui c/o Avery Dennison Corporation 150 N. Orange Grove Blvd. Pasadena, California 91103 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 12885901.4 | 25.09.2012 | WO2012CN81885 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014047768 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2901509 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/00, H01M2/02, G09F3/10, C09J7/02, C09J11/00, C09J133/00, G09F23/00, G09F3/02 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
C09J7/385 (EP,CN,US);
G09F23/00 (EP,CN,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,CN,US);
C09J11/00 (EP,CN,US);
C09J133/00 (US);
C09J7/25 (EP,US);
H01M50/121 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/124 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/143 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2203/33 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2433/00 (US);
C09J2479/086 (EP,CN,US);
G09F2003/023 (EP,CN,US);
G09F2003/0251 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T428/263 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | H01M2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | SCHWARZES BATTERIEETIKETT AUS POLYIMID | [2015/32] | English: | BLACK POLYIMIDE BATTERY LABEL | [2015/32] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE DE BATTERIE AU POLYIMIDE NOIR | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 07.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.04.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2015 | 30.09.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2011029225 (BRADY WORLDWIDE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]EP2404972 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0045] ** paragraph [0143] * | International search | [A]US5709918 (KIMIJIMA TAKAO [JP], et al); | [X]CN102131640 (BRADY WORLDWIDE INC); | [A]CN102634022 (CHINESE ACAD INST CHEMISTRY) |