EP2907638 - CUTTING METHOD FOR HONEYCOMB DRIED BODY, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE, HONEYCOMB DRIED BODY, AND HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd 1 Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKINO Hayato c/o IBIDEN CO. LTD. Ogaki Kita Plant 1-1 Kitagata Ibigawacho Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA Shigeharu c/o IBIDEN CO. LTD. Ogaki Kita Plant 1-1 Kitagata Ibigawacho Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 12886122.6 | 05.10.2012 | [2015/34] | WO2012JP75977 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014054168 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907638 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B24C1/04, B29C47/00, B28B11/24, B28B17/00, B28B11/16, B29D99/00, C04B38/00, F01N3/022 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
B24C1/045 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (US);
B01J37/0018 (US);
B28B11/163 (EP,US);
B28B11/243 (EP,US);
B28B17/0036 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29D99/0089 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (US);
B01D46/2451 (US);
B01D46/2455 (US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B29K2001/08 (EP,US);
B29L2024/006 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | B28B11/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON GETROCKNETEN WABENKÖRPERN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE WABENSTRUKTUR, GETROCKNETER WABENKÖRPER UND WABENSTRUKTUR | [2015/34] | English: | CUTTING METHOD FOR HONEYCOMB DRIED BODY, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE, HONEYCOMB DRIED BODY, AND HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE | [2015/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOUPE DE CORPS SÉCHÉ EN NID D'ABEILLES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLES, CORPS SÉCHÉ EN NID D'ABEILLES ET STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLES | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2015 | Translation filed | 13.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 01.12.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0242503 (IG TECH RES INC [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,10,16-18 * figures 14,15 * * column 12, line 55 - column 13, line 52 * [I] 15; | [XY]US5670104 (MIURA YASUNAO [JP], et al) [X] 18 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 33-60 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, lines 3-9 * [Y] 1-17; | [A]US2004198599 (KATO SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]US2007277655 (KAWAI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0154] , [0161] , [0167] - [0169] - [0176] , [0178] * | International search | [X]JPH07256622 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [X]JP2004358843 (MIYOTA KK) | by applicant | JP2004358843 | JP2007320312 |