EP2921064 - INTELLIGENT CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joyetech (Changzhou) Electronics Co., Ltd. No. 7 Fengxiang Road Changzhou Jiangsu 213022 / CN | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Weihua Room 607 No.2 Fuchen Building 8th Taihu East Road Xinbei Changzhou Jiangsu 213022 / CN | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Hermann, Felix Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2015/39] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 12888511.8 | 14.12.2012 | [2015/39] | WO2012CN86607 | Priority number, date | CN201210455135 | 13.11.2012 Original published format: CN201210455135 | [2015/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014075369 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921064 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2921064 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
H05B1/0244 (EP,US);
A24F40/53 (EP,US);
A24F40/60 (EP,US);
G06F13/387 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE STEUERUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2015/39] | English: | INTELLIGENT CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2015/39] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR INTELLIGENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | Translation filed | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 16.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17206828.0 / EP3320792 | EP19183716.0 / EP3571944 | EP20203610.9 / EP3796750 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones IP Limited BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | 02
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | 03
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE KELTIE LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB Opponent's representative Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2023/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones IP Limited BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | ||
02
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | |||
03
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE KELTIE LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB Opponent's representative Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | |||
Former [2021/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones IP Limited BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
02
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | |||
03
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE KELTIE LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB Opponent's representative Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | |||
Former [2020/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones IP Limited BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
02
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | |||
03
23.10.2019
29.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE KELTIE LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB Opponent's representative Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | |||
Former [2019/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones IP Limited BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
02
23.10.2019
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
03
23.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE KELTIE LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB Opponent's representative Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | 07.11.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.11.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/03] | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 13.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1530/21 | 13.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 10.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1530/21 | 10.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 16.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2012 | AL | 23.01.2019 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | IE | 14.12.2019 | LU | 14.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.12.2012 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.12.2012 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003154991 (FOURNIER JAY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0065] *; | [A]CN102727969 (JOY CHANGZHOU ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] * | International search | [A]US6766220 (MCRAE DOUGLAS D [US], et al); | [X]CN201352950Y (HAORAN XIA [CN]); | [X]CN201878765U (CHANGZHOU FUAIFA IMP & EXP CO LTD); | [X]CN202233002U (GONGYUN LONG); | [E]CN202890465U (JOYE CHANGZHOU ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) | Opposition | US2009320863 | WO2012085203 | CN102727969 | WO2014075369 | US2004129793 | US2006047368 | CN201226775Y | US2010242974 | CN201878765U | WO2011137453 | EP2468116 | CN202364801U | EP2489391 | WO2012120487 | KR9013211U | US6766220 | CA2641869 | KR200454110Y | US2011265806 | US8212763 | - Anonymous, "ProVari Owner`s Manual", Internet Archive Wayback Machine, (20111112), pages 1 - 16, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20111112004819/ http://www.provape.com:80/v/ima ges/ProVariManual.pdf, XP055652263 | - "ProVape", ProVari Owner's Manual, (20120127), pages 1 - 16, XP055649691 | - "Buck-boost converter", Wikipedia, (20121014), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Buck-boost_converter&oldid=517807824, XP055652791 | - "1 MHz, Low-Power Op Amp", Microchip data sheet, MCP6001/1R/1U/2/4, (2008), pages 1 - 30, XP055652806 | - "USB", Wikipedia, (20051217), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=USB&oldid=31677631, XP055652810 | - "Low Power DC/DC boost converter in SOT-23 package", Texas Instruments product information TPS61040/TPS61041, (2002), pages 1 - 20, XP055652816 |