EP2925650 - PROJECTILE DISPENSING SYSTEM AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envirologics Engineeering Inc. Unit 5 193 Manitoba Street Bracebridge, Ontario P1L 1S3 / CA | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCHFELLNER, John Unit 5, 193 Manitoba Street Bracebridge, Ontario P1L 1S3 / CA | 02 /
LILLIE, Kevin Unit 5, 193 Manitoba Street Bracebridge, Ontario P1L 1S3 / CA | 03 /
MARSHALL, Dave Unit 5, 193 Manitoba Street Bracebridge, Ontario P1L 1S3 / CA | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | D'Arcy, Julia Harrison IP 1st Floor Box Tree House Northminster Business Park, Northfield Lane York, YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12889008.4 | 27.11.2012 | [2015/41] | WO2012CA50854 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014082154 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2925650 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/027, B24C3/32, F16L55/46 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
B08B9/057 (EP,US);
B24C3/327 (EP,US);
B24C7/0092 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/41] | B65G53/40, B08B9/027, F16L55/46, F28G1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | GESCHOSSABGABESYSTEM UND VERWENDUNG | [2015/41] | English: | PROJECTILE DISPENSING SYSTEM AND USE | [2015/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE PROJECTILES ET SON UTILISATION | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 24.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 19.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4222502 (GUBITOSE NICHOLAS F, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 2, line 35 - line 52 * * column 3, line 1 - line 12 * * column 5, line 60 - line 64 * * claim - * * figure - * [Y] 3-5 [I] 8; | [YDA]WO2008029149 (WHIRLWIND UTILITIES LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 3 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 15 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 16 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1,8; | [YA]US4236654 (MELLO FRANK A) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 50 * * column 3, line 37 - line 43 * * column 4, line 10 - line 55 * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [XI]WO9207781 (LIM JOO SANG [KR]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 13 * * page 2, line 7 - line 15 * * page 4, line 2 - line 27 * * claim - * * figure - * [I] 8; | [A]JPH06270065 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1,3,6-8 * abstract * * figure - * | International search | [X]US4236654 (MELLO FRANK A); | [Y]US5129505 (WINTER GREGORY C [US], et al); | [Y]US2087694 (GUSTAF MALMROS) |