EP2926025 - HYDRAULIC SUSPENSION DAMPER WITH POSITION DEPENDENT DAMPING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BeijingWest Industries Co. Ltd. No. 85 Puan Road Doudian Town Fangshan District Beijing / CN | [2017/07] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states BeijingWest Industries Co. Ltd. No. 1 Jiao Dao Dong Xi Da Jie Doudian Town Fangshan District Beijing 102402 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUS, Pawel Edward Os. Dywizjonu 303 64/47 PL-31-875 Kraków / PL | 02 /
GRZESIK, Radoslaw Pawel Pcim 724 PL-32-432 Pcim / PL | 03 /
FLACHT, Piotr Andrzej Tadeusza Kantora 2/23 PL-31-445 Kraków / PL | 04 /
FIREK, Lukasz Karol Pradnicka 58/109 PL-31-202 Kraków / PL | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Lukaszyk, Szymon Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk Ul. Glowackiego 8/5 40-052 Katowice / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Lukaszyk, Szymon Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk ul. Glowackiego 8/6 40-052 Katowice / PL | ||
Former [2015/41] | Lukaszyk, Szymon Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk Ul. Glowackiego 8/6 40-052 Katowice / PL | Application number, filing date | 12889431.8 | 03.12.2012 | [2015/41] | WO2012CN85728 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014085954 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2926025 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2926025 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/49, F16F9/18, F16F9/48 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
F16F9/49 (EP,CN,US);
F16F9/585 (US);
F16F9/18 (US);
F16F9/34 (US);
F16F9/3488 (US);
F16F9/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/41] | F16F9/49, F16F9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHER AUFHÄNGUNGSDÄMPFER MIT POSITIONSABHÄNGIGER DÄMPFUNGSANORDNUNG | [2015/41] | English: | HYDRAULIC SUSPENSION DAMPER WITH POSITION DEPENDENT DAMPING ASSEMBLY | [2015/41] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE SUSPENSION HYDRAULIQUE À ENSEMBLE AMORTISSEUR DÉPENDANT DE LA POSITION | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 12.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2012 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | IE | 03.12.2018 | LU | 03.12.2018 | MT | 03.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.12.2012 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2717058 (BRUNDRETT GEORGE A) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH01166151U (ATSUGI AUTO PARTS) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]ES2152798 (AP AMORTIGUADORES S A [ES]) [A] 1-7* figure 2 *; | [A]US2009078518 (GAGNON PASCAL [CA], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 3, 4 * | International search | [A]JPS6228539 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]US4768629 (WOESSNER FELIX [DE]); | [A]JP2006170243 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]CN201377535Y (SHANGHAI XIAOKAI SHOCK ABSORBER CO LTD); | [A]CN202100643U (TIANJIN TIANDE SUSPENSION SYS); | [A]CN202510610U (RUI AN CITY DARRO SHOCK ABSORBER CO LTD) |