EP2822726 - METHOD OF CLADDING AND FUSION WELDING OF SUPERALLOYS USING COMPOSITE FILLER POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBURDI ENGINEERING LIMITED 400 Highway 6 North Dundas, Ontario L9H 7K4 / CA | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONCHAROV, Alexander B. 10 Tefley Road Toronto, Ontario M2M 1C4 / CA | 02 /
LIBURDI, Joseph 1145 Brock Road R.R. 4 Dundas, Ontario L9H 5E4 / CA | 03 /
LOWDEN, Paul 73 Johnston Avenue Cambridge, Ontario N3C 1N3 / CA | 04 /
HASTIE, Scott 88 Arlington Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6G 3L1 / CA | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbB Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte PartG mbH Küfergasse 11 89073 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2015/03] | Spengler, Robert Potthast & Spengler Patentanwälte Küfergasse 11 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 12889603.2 | 05.12.2012 | [2019/21] | WO2012CA01118 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014085892 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822726 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822726 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/19, B23K1/005, B23K9/23, B23K35/30, B23K9/04, B23K26/32, B23K35/02, B23K35/22, C21D9/50, C22F1/10, F01D5/00, B23K26/342, // B23K101/00, B23K103/02, B23K103/18 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
B23K35/22 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/34 (RU);
B23K1/0018 (EP,CN,US);
B23K1/19 (US);
B23K1/005 (US);
B23K1/0056 (EP,CN,US);
B23K2103/08 (CN);
B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,RU,US);
B23K35/0244 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/24 (RU);
B23K35/30 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/3033 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/304 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/3046 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/32 (RU);
B23K9/042 (EP,CN,US);
B23K9/23 (EP,CN,US);
B23P6/00 (RU);
F01D5/005 (EP,CN,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,CN,US);
B23K2103/02 (EP,US);
B23K2103/18 (EP,US);
B23K2103/26 (EP,US);
C21D9/50 (EP,CN,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,CN,US);
F05D2230/232 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | B23K26/34, B23K35/22, B23K9/04, B23K1/00, B23K9/23, B23K35/30, B23K26/32, B23K35/02, F01D5/00, B23K101/00, B23K103/08, B23K26/342, B23K1/005, // C21D9/50, C22F1/10 | ||
Former IPC [2015/03] | B23K26/34, B23K35/22, B23K9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM UMHÜLLEN UND SCHMELZSCHWEISSEN VON SUPERLEGIERUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES FÜLLPULVERS | [2015/03] | English: | METHOD OF CLADDING AND FUSION WELDING OF SUPERALLOYS USING COMPOSITE FILLER POWDER | [2015/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECHARGEMENT ET DE SOUDAGE PAR FUSION DE SUPERALLIAGES AU MOYEN D'UNE POUDRE D'APPORT COMPOSITE | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 30.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2012 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | LU | 05.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 22.05.2019 | |
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 22.05.2019 | |
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4381944 (SMITH JR MURRAY S, et al) [A] 8-10 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 41 * * tables I,II,III ** claims 1,9 *; | [A]WO9322097 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, lines 1-12 *; | [I]US2003136811 (PHILIP VINOD MOHAN [US]) [I] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0032] *; | [A]EP2055424 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0003] * | International search | [Y]US6998568 (BREHM WALTER [CH], et al); | [Y]US2006249231 (BEZERRA PATRICIA [US], et al); | [A]US2007272332 (ABRILES BETH KWIATKOWKI [US], et al); | [A]US2010196193 (MINOR MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]WO2012065581 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) | Examination | US6454885 | US6872912 |