EP2938488 - METALLIZATION AND SURFACE COATING SOLUTION ON GLASS FILLER HIGH PERFORMANCE AMORPHOUS POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Liang 2550 Xiupu Road, Kangqino Pudong Shanghai 201319 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Yangang 2550 Xiupu Road, Kangqino Pudong Shanghai 201319 / CN | 03 /
FENG, Wei 2550 Xiupu Road, Kangqino Pudong Shanghai 201319 / CN | [2015/49] |
Former [2015/45] | 01 /
SHEN, Liang GE (China) Research and Development Center Co. Ltd. 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
02 /
YAN, Yangang GE (China) Research and Development Center Co. Ltd. 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
03 /
FENG, Wei GE (China) Research and Development Center Co. Ltd. 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-tech Park, Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 12891273.0 | 31.12.2012 | [2015/45] | WO2012CN88051 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101188 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938488 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/04, B32B27/14, B32B5/02, C23C14/14, C23C14/20, C23C16/06, C08J7/04, C08J7/12, C08K7/14 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B05D7/02 (US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
C23C14/20 (EP,US);
C23C14/26 (US);
C23C14/34 (US);
C23C26/00 (US);
C23C28/00 (US);
G11B33/027 (US);
G11B33/1493 (US);
B29C45/0013 (US);
B29C70/58 (US);
B29K2079/085 (US);
B29K2081/00 (US);
B29K2105/16 (US);
B29K2509/08 (US);
C08J2379/08 (EP,US);
C08J2433/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | B32B27/04, B32B27/14, B32B5/02, C23C14/14, C23C14/20, C23C16/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | METALLISIERUNGS- UND OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGSLÖSUNG AUF AMORPHEN HOCHLEISTUNGS-POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR GLASFÜLLER | [2015/45] | English: | METALLIZATION AND SURFACE COATING SOLUTION ON GLASS FILLER HIGH PERFORMANCE AMORPHOUS POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2015/45] | French: | SOLUTION DE MÉTALLISATION ET DE REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE SUR DES COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES AMORPHES HAUTES PERFORMANCES CONTENANT UNE CHARGE DE VERRE | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0391201 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11,13,14 * page 2, lines 38-43; example 1; claim -; table II *; | [XI]WO02102899 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4,10-14 * page 4, lines 20-27; claim - * * page 5, lines 13-29 * * page 1, lines 7-25 * [I] 5,6,15; | [A]EP1835505 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0042]; claim - *; | [X]WO2011061211 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,13,14 * example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US4952448 (BULLOCK DANIEL E [US], et al); | [A]US5945213 (NAGAIKE IPPEI [JP], et al) |