EP2624587 - Radio module, in particular a detection device for the detection and communication of consumption data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl Metering Systems GmbH Donaustrasse 120 90451 Nürnberg / DE | [2014/18] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Hydrometer Electronic GmbH Donaustrasse 120 90451 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Markus Gartenstr. 11 90522 Oberasbach / DE | 02 /
Gottschalk, Roland Blütenstr. 2 90530 Wendelstein / DE | 03 /
Becke, Gerhard Tannenweg 4 91301 Forchheim / DE | 04 /
Gottschalk, Klaus Schulstr. 9 90610 Winkelhaid / DE | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/39] |
Former [2013/32] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13000300.7 | 22.01.2013 | [2013/32] | Priority number, date | DE20121001772 | 31.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012001772 | [2013/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2624587 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2624587 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2624587 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2624587 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
H04Q2209/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2013/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Funkmodul, insbesondere Erfassungseinrichtung zum Ermitteln und Übermitteln von Verbrauchsdaten | [2013/32] | English: | Radio module, in particular a detection device for the detection and communication of consumption data | [2013/32] | French: | Module radio, en particulier dispositif de saisie destiné à déterminer et transmettre des données de consommation | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 28.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.2019
ADMISSIBLE Zenner International GmbH & Co. KG Römerstadt 6 66121 Saarbrücken / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB Feldmannstraße 110 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | [2019/33] | 26.07.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.11.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2020 | 09.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.08.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2013 | AL | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | MT | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | AT | 22.01.2019 | IE | 22.01.2019 | LU | 22.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.01.2013 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
AT | 22.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004174270 (CHOI CHANG HO [KR]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]WO2006055478 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-8* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021] *; | [XYI]DE102004055659 (METRONA WAERMEMESSER UNION [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0072] * [Y] 4 [I] 7,8 | Opposition | US2004174270 | WO2006055478 | DE102004055659 | EP2025445 | DE102009028794 | - "Dipolantenne", Finkenzeller, Klaus, RFID-Handbuch - Grundlagen und praktische Anwendungen von Transpondern, kontaktlosen Chipkarten und NFC, München, HANSER, (20080000), pages 138 - 139 , 349-354, 469, ISBN 978-3-446-41200-2, XP055623562 |