EP2657414 - Transportable sanitary unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAD Investments B.V. Oranjestraat 43 3361 HN Sliedrecht / NL | [2015/39] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Bikker, Marcel Adriaan Dirk Oranjestraat 43 3361 HN Sliedrecht / NL | ||
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Bikker, Marcel Adriaan Dirk Rijksstraatweg 155 3316 EG Dordrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bikker, Marcel Adriaan Dirk Oranjestraat 43 3361 HN Sliedrecht / NL | [2015/39] |
Former [2013/44] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Ferguson BV Da Costaplein 3 3818 HE Amersfoort / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Ferguson BV P.O. Box 970 3800 AZ Amersfoort / NL | ||
Former [2013/44] | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Ferguson BV P.O. Box 970 3800 AZ Amersfoort / NL | Application number, filing date | 13000651.3 | 07.02.2013 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | NL20121039356 | 07.02.2012 Original published format: NL 1039356 | [2013/44] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2657414 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2657414 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2657414 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/00, E03D7/00, E03B7/00, E04B1/343, E04H1/12 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
E03D7/00 (EP);
B65D88/12 (RU);
B65D88/22 (RU);
E03B7/00 (EP);
E04H1/1216 (EP);
E04H1/1266 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | E03D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2013/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Transportierbare Toiletteneinheit | [2013/44] | English: | Transportable sanitary unit | [2013/44] | French: | Unité sanitaire transportable | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2013 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | MT | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | TR | 22.12.2021 | IE | 07.02.2022 | LU | 07.02.2022 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
TR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.02.2022 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2063109 (ZDZISLAW BORYS, REGIS BOGNOR) [X] 1 * figure 25 * [I] 2; | [XAI]US4653125 (PORTER ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1 * figures 5,6 * [A] 10-13 [I] 2; | [A]WO8707665 (GARICH NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1,15* figure 1 *; | [A]JPH11350759 (SHOWA AIRCRAFT IND) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO02103138 (SHIPPAX LTD OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * page 6, line 28 - line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE20312312U (MOELLER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]US2005284035 (DEOVANDO MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * figures 1,2,6A,8,9 * [A] 10-15; | [A]JP3983262B (IITAKA TOMOYUKI) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2011110725 (MARTELO MUNOZ PABLO [ES]) [A] 1,10-14 * abstract * | Examination | WO0217764 |