EP2633765 - Instant compositions comprising polydextrose, the production and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hövelmann, Julia Leerbachstrasse 79 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 02 /
Hönkemeyer, Nadine Kurfürstenstrasse 11 60486 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 03 /
Berlekamp, Uwe Am Bartelssteinweg 13 31860 Emmertal / DE | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Müller, Claudia European Patent Attorney Uhlandstrasse 58 60314 Frankfurt / Main / DE | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 13000887.3 | 22.02.2013 | [2013/36] | Priority number, date | DE20121004307 | 01.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012004307 | DE20122006723U | 01.03.2012 Original published format: DE 202012006723 U | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633765 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/39, A23L2/52, A61K9/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23F3/34 (EP);
A23L2/39 (EP);
A23L2/56 (EP);
A23L2/60 (EP);
A23L33/25 (EP);
F24S40/20 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2002/00, A23V2250/032, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/242, A23V2250/2482, A23V2250/5114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Instant-Zubereitungen mit Polydextrose, Herstellung und Verwendung | [2013/36] | English: | Instant compositions comprising polydextrose, the production and use thereof | [2013/36] | French: | Compositions instantanes comprennant le polydextrose, la production et l'utilisation de ceux-ci | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US4622233 (TORRES ANIBAL [US]) [XD] 1,2,7-9,11,12 * column 1 - column 6; examples 1-23,48; claims 1-5 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 3,4,10,13; | [Y]WO9214761 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0570327 (FUISZ TECHNOLOGIES LTD [US]) [I] 1-4,7,8,11,12 * page 1 - page 5, line 23 * * example 4 * * claims 1-23 *; | [A]EP0570328 (FUISZ TECHNOLOGIES LTD [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0821885 (RAFFINERIE TIRLEMONTOISE SA [BE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5976603 (KOTA SURESH B [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008152779 (DE GROOTE EVELYNE [CH], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XP]DE202012006723U (MERZ PHARMA GMBH & CO KGAA [DE]) [XP] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A] - Mintel, "Instant Cocoa Mix", GNPD, MINTEL, (201102), Database accession no. 1494747, XP002699341 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4622233 | DE4123124 | US5424418 | US5601863 | US5620871 | DE69418973T | WO0011971 | WO2004075664 | DE202005013596U | WO2006108592 | DE102005040666 | DE202008007759U | WO2010020321 | DE202010001912U | DE102010009654 | WO2011141150 | - Römpp Chemielexikon, GEORG-THIEME-VERLAG, (1997), vol. 3, page 1936 |