EP2633749 - Harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states PÖTTINGER Landtechnik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik Ges.m.b.H. Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Putz, Christian Stöfling 21/1 4850 Timelkam / AT | 02 /
Lehner, Josef St. Thomas 12 4732 St. Thomas / AT | 03 /
Greifeneder, August Rosenau 77 4707 Schlüsslberg / AT | 04 /
Kreupl, Walter . 4676 Aistersheim 46 / AT | [2018/45] |
Former [2013/43] | 01 /
Putz, Christian Stöfling 21/1 4850 Timelkam / AT | ||
02 /
Lehner, Josef . 4732 St. Thomas 12 / AT | |||
03 /
Greifeneder, August Rosenau 77 4707 Schlüsslberg / AT | |||
04 /
Kreupl, Walter . 4676 Aistersheim 46 / AT | |||
Former [2013/36] | 01 /
Putz, Christian Stöfling 21/1 4850 Timelkam / AT | ||
02 /
Lehner, Joseph . 4732 St. Thomas 12 / AT | |||
03 /
Greifeneder, August Rosenau 77 4707 Schlüsslberg / AT | |||
04 /
Kreupl, Walter . 4676 Aistersheim 46 / AT | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2018/46] |
Former [2013/36] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001025.9 | 28.02.2013 | [2013/36] | Priority number, date | DE20122002112U | 29.02.2012 Original published format: DE 202012002112 U | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633749 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633749 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01D82/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A01D43/105 (EP);
A01D82/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2013/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Erntemaschine | [2013/36] | English: | Harvester | [2013/36] | French: | Moissonneuse | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 07.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2013 | AL | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | MT | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | AT | 28.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | GB | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.02.2013 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 28.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 28.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 28.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
AT | 28.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 14.11.2018 | |
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3393499 (HARER DELMAR C, et al) [I] 1,4,6-8,10,11 * column 2, lines 10-31; figure 1 *; | [IA]US4068453 (HILL AMOS, et al) [I] 1-4,6-8,10,11 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 45; figures 2,3 * [A] 5,9; | [I]CA2136499 (MACDON IND LTD [CA]) [I] 1-11 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 3 *; | [AD]DE102005050157 (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [AD] 1-11* page 4, paragraphs 25-30 * | by applicant | DE102005050157 |