EP2658181 - Connection device for data communication between two vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heise, Bernd Feldstr. 12 30823 Garbsen / DE | 02 /
Stender, Axel Adolfstr. 2 31787 Hameln / DE | 03 /
Witte, Norbert Paul-Klee-Str. 3 31867 Lauenau / DE | [2013/44] | Application number, filing date | 13001167.9 | 08.03.2013 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | DE20121008408 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012008408 | [2013/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2658181 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2658181 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, B60T13/66, B61L15/00 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H04L12/40182 (EP);
B60T17/046 (EP);
B61L15/0036 (EP);
H04L2012/40215 (EP);
H04L2012/40273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | Verbindungseinrichtung zur Datenkommunikation zwischen zwei Fahrzeugen | [2013/44] | English: | Connection device for data communication between two vehicles | [2013/44] | French: | Dispositif de liaison pour la communication de données entre deux véhicules | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 29.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2013 | AL | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | RS | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | IE | 08.03.2015 | LU | 08.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 21.01.2015 | |
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 21.01.2015 | |
NO | 21.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102010027283 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * figures 2-5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0043] , [0048] , [0050] , [0052] , [0054] , [0059] *; | [Y]EP2060457 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] *; | [A] - PARAL THOMAS, "IP network backbone with era_transceiver, 1 GBit/s communication over automatic couplers", (20091106), pages 1 - 31, ERA-CONTACT FIRMENPRÄSENTATION,, URL: http://www.ukintpress-conferences.com/conf/09rix_conf/pdfs/Day%202/12_Thomas_Paral.pdf, XP002666073 [A] 1-9 * page 9 - page 13 * |