EP2644727 - Aluminum alloy forged material for automotive vehicles and production method for the material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/40] | Aluminium alloy forged material for automotive vehicles and production method for the material | ||
[2013/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Masayuki c/o Daian Plant in Kobe Steel, Ltd., Umedo 1100 Daian-cho Inabe-shi, Mie, 511-0200 / JP | 02 /
Inagaki, Yoshiya c/o Daian Plant in Kobe Steel, Ltd., Umedo 1100 Daian-cho Inabe-shi, Mie, 511-0200 / JP | 03 /
Nakai, Manabu c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd., 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-2271 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001479.8 | 22.03.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | JP20120081071 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012081071 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2644727 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2644727 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | [2013/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2644727 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2644727 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/08, C22F1/047, C22F1/05 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
C22F1/05 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C22C21/04 (EP,US);
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22F1/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | Geschmiedetes Aluminiumlegierungsmaterial für Fahrzeuge und Produktionsverfahren für das Material | [2013/40] | English: | Aluminum alloy forged material for automotive vehicles and production method for the material | [2013/47] | French: | Matériau forgé en alliage d'aluminium pour véhicules automobiles et procédé de production de ce matériau | [2013/40] |
Former [2013/40] | Aluminium alloy forged material for automotive vehicles and production method for the material | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 14.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2013 | AL | 10.09.2014 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | IT | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | RS | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | SM | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | IE | 22.03.2015 | LU | 22.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.03.2013 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MK | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.03.2013 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 22.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 22.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010089503 (INAGAKI YOSHIYA [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0018] , [0020] , [0022] , [0024] , [0034] , [0038] , [0040] , [0047] - [0063] - [0082] , [0084] , [0086] , [0090] , [0092] , [0093] - paragraphs [0099] , [0101] , [0107] , [0110] , [0114]; table 1 * |