EP2645546 - Linear motor cooling structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohira, Daisuke Yokosuka Works of Sumitomo Heavy Industries LTD. 19, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8555 / JP | 02 /
Usui, Doutaro Yokosuka Works of Sumitomo Heavy Industries LTD. 19, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8555 / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Takashi Yokosuka Works of Sumitomo Heavy Industries LTD. 19, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8555 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001521.7 | 25.03.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | JP20120071555 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012071555 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2645546 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2645546 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/197, H02K41/02, H02K9/19, H02K9/22 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
H02K41/02 (EP,US);
H02K9/12 (KR);
H02K1/32 (KR);
H02K9/22 (US);
H02K9/227 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | H02K9/197, H02K41/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Linearmotor-Kühlstruktur | [2013/40] | English: | Linear motor cooling structure | [2013/40] | French: | Structure de refroidissement de moteur linéaire | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003141769 (KUBO HIROYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 6 * figure 6 ** paragraph [0096] *; | [Y]US2007257563 (HUANG LIEH-FENG [TW], et al) [Y] 4,5 * figure 1 * * column 17 *; | [XY]EP2348617 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2A,2B,7,10,11,17,18A,18B * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047] * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]EP2424087 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3,7A,7B,7C * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] * [Y] 4-6 |