EP2615185 - Production method for carbonaceous material-containing metal oxide briquettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2013/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Takao c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko SHO (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-SHI, Hyogo, 651-8585 / JP | 02 /
Sugitatsu, Hiroshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko SHO (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-SHI, Hyogo, 651-8585 / JP | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001551.4 | 23.05.2008 | [2013/29] | Priority number, date | JP20070140816 | 28.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007140816 | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2615185 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/244, C22B1/248, B30B11/16 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
C22B1/245 (EP,US);
C22B1/244 (KR);
B30B11/16 (EP,KR,US);
B30B15/308 (EP,US);
C22B1/248 (EP,KR,US);
C22B7/02 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | Produktionsverfahren für kohlenstoffmaterialhaltige Metalloxidbriketts | [2013/29] | English: | Production method for carbonaceous material-containing metal oxide briquettes | [2013/29] | French: | Procédé de production de briquettes d'oxyde métallique contenant un matériau carboné | [2013/29] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 10.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08764573.5 / EP2172571 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080764573) is 08.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5912403 (BILKE THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 7 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2006241577 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US3189436 (BURSTLEIN EUGENE M) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4001007 (SASAKI MINORU, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2004269978 | JPH09192896 | JPH1192833 |