EP2660342 - Acid and alkali resistant nickel-chromium-molybdenum-copper alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haynes International, Inc. 1020 West Park Avenue Post Office Box 9013 Kokomo, Indiana 46904-9013 / US | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deodeshmukh, Vinay P. 1876 Hogan Drive Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | 02 /
Meck, Nacera Sabrina 2111 Holzwarth Road Apt. 206 Spring, Texas 77388 / US | 03 /
Crook, Paul 1409 Green Acres Drive Kokomo, Indiana 46901 / US | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [2015/08] |
Former [2013/45] | Fritzsche, Thomas Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13002282.5 | 29.04.2013 | [2013/45] | Priority number, date | US201261640096P | 30.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261640096 P | US201213719369 | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US201213719369 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2660342 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2660342 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C22F1/10 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
C22C19/055 (EP,US);
C22C19/05 (KR);
C22C19/053 (EP,GB,US);
C22C1/04 (KR);
C22C30/02 (GB);
C22F1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | Säure und alkaliresistente Nickel-Chrom-Molybdän-Kupferlegierungen | [2013/45] | English: | Acid and alkali resistant nickel-chromium-molybdenum-copper alloys | [2013/45] | French: | Alliages de nickel-chrome-molybdène-cuivre résistants aux acides et alcalins | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 22.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2013 | AL | 18.02.2015 | AT | 18.02.2015 | BE | 18.02.2015 | BG | 18.02.2015 | CY | 18.02.2015 | CZ | 18.02.2015 | EE | 18.02.2015 | FI | 18.02.2015 | HR | 18.02.2015 | LT | 18.02.2015 | LV | 18.02.2015 | MC | 18.02.2015 | MK | 18.02.2015 | MT | 18.02.2015 | PL | 18.02.2015 | PT | 18.02.2015 | RO | 18.02.2015 | RS | 18.02.2015 | SI | 18.02.2015 | SK | 18.02.2015 | SM | 18.02.2015 | TR | 18.02.2015 | IE | 29.04.2015 | LU | 29.04.2015 | GR | 19.05.2015 | IS | 18.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 29.04.2013 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MK | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PT | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.04.2013 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MK | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.04.2013 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
RS | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3844774 (CULLING J); | [A]US4836985 (CULLING JOHN H [US]); | [AD]US6740291 (CROOK PAUL [US]); | [XDAI]US6764646 (CROOK PAUL [US], et al); | [A]EP2256220 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]); | [A]WO2011034100 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6280540 | US6623869 | US6740291 | US6764646 | US2008279716 | US2010034690 |