EP2696278 - Mobile terminal and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravi, Kumar V. Vinnakota c/o LG Soft India Private Limited Cherry Hills Embassy Golf Links Business Park 560071 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
Pradeep, Kumar Mudgal c/o LG Soft India Private Limited Cherry Hills Embassy Golf Links Business Park 560071 Bangalore / IN | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13002587.7 | 16.05.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | KR20120087454 | 09.08.2012 Original published format: KR 20120087454 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2696278 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2696278 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/147, G09G5/14 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (KR);
G06F3/0484 (KR,US);
G06F3/147 (KR);
H04B1/401 (KR);
H04N13/117 (KR);
G09G2340/125 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
G09G2370/16 (EP,US);
G09G2370/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | G06F3/147 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2014/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2014/07] | English: | Mobile terminal and control method therefor | [2014/07] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006087556 (ERA KAZUNARI [JP]) [A] 7-9 * figures 1, 4-7 ** paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0061] *; | [X]US2008253737 (KIMURA MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0040] - [0046] *; | [XI]US2010026721 (PARK HYUN-HEE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,14 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0024] - [0029] - [0042] , [0047] - [0051] * [I] 3-6,8-13,15; | [X]US2010134506 (RO SI-JEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,12-14 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0054] , [0060] , [0062] , [0082] , [0084] , [0105] , [0117] , [0130] , [0132] * |