EP2648124 - Computer-implemented biological sequence identifier system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as Represented by the Secretary of the Navy Naval Research Laboratory Code 1008.2 4555 Overlook Avenue, SW Washington, DC 20375 / US | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnur, Joel, M. 6009 Lincolnwood St.; Burke, VA 22015 / US | 02 /
Stenger, David, A. 2520 Brofferton Ct. Herndon, VA 20171 / US | 03 /
Malanoski, Anthony P. 14 Seaton Place NE Washington D.C. 20002 / US | 04 /
Lin, Baochuan 5905 Rudyard Dr. Betheda, MD 20814 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Frühlingstrasse 43A 45130 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13002755.0 | 09.06.2006 | [2013/41] | Priority number, date | US20050691768P | 16.06.2005 Original published format: US 691768 P | US20050177647 | 02.07.2005 Original published format: US 177647 | US20050177646 | 02.07.2005 Original published format: US 177646 | US20050268373 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 268373 | US20050735876P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 735876 P | US20050735824P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 735824 P | US20060743639P | 22.03.2006 Original published format: US 743639 P | US20060422431 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 422431 | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2648124 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2648124 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/22, G06F19/18, G06F19/20, // C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99936 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | G06F19/22, // C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | Computerimplementiertes System und Verfahren zur Identifizierung biologischer Sequenzen | [2013/41] | English: | Computer-implemented biological sequence identifier system and method | [2013/41] | French: | Système d'identification de séquence biologique mis en oeuvre par ordinateur et procédé | [2013/41] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06772795.8 / EP1910577 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2013 | 30.06.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004023275 (BERNO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0126] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - THOMAS BRIESE ET AL, "Diagnostic System for Rapid and Sensitive Differential Detection of Pathogens", EMERGING INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (20050201), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.3201/eid1102.040492, ISSN 1080-6040, pages 310 - 313, XP055137346 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3201/eid1102.040492 | [A] - WILSON W J ET AL, "Sequence-specific identification of 18 pathogenic microorganisms using microarray technology", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20020401), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1006/MCPR.2001.0397, ISSN 0890-8508, pages 119 - 127, XP004466435 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.2001.0397 | [A] - GINGERAS THOMAS R ET AL, "Simultaneous genotyping and species identification using hybridization pattern recognition analysis of generic Mycobacterium DNA arrays", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (19980501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 435 - 448, XP002156298 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [T] - A. P. MALANOSKI ET AL, "Automated identification of multiple micro-organisms from resequencing DNA microarrays", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20060920), vol. 34, no. 18, doi:10.1093/nar/gkl565, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 5300 - 5311, XP055137355 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkl565 | by applicant | - WHELEN, A.C.; PERSING, D.H., "The role of nucleic acid amplification and detection in the clinical microbiology laboratory", ANNU REV MICROBIOL, (1996), vol. 50, pages 349 - 373 | - MCDONOUGH, E.A.; BARROZO, C.P.; RUSSELL, K.L.; METZGAR, D., "A multiplex PCR for detection of Mycoplasma pneumoniae, Chlamydophila pneumoniae, Legionella pneumophila, and Bordetella pertussis in clinical specimens", MOL CELL PROBES, (2005), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mcp.2005.05.002, pages 314 - 322, XP005072437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mcp.2005.05.002 | - ROTH, S.B.; JALAVA, J.; RUUSKANEN, 0.; RUOHOLA, A.; NIKKARI, S., "Use of an oligonucleotide array for laboratory diagnosis of bacteria responsible for acute upper respiratory infections.", J CLIN MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1128/JCM.42.9.4268-4274.2004, pages 4268 - 4274, XP055100175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.9.4268-4274.2004 | - GARDNER, S.N.; KUCZMARSKI, T.A.; VITALIS, E.A.; SLEZAK, T.R., "Limitations of TaqMan PCR for detecting divergent viral pathogens illustrated by hepatitis A, B, C, and E viruses and human immunodeficiency virus", J CLIN MICROBIAL, (2003), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1128/jcm.41.6.2417-2427.2003, pages 2417 - 2427, XP002651429 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/jcm.41.6.2417-2427.2003 | - ECKER, D.J.; SAMPATH, R.; BLYN, L.B.; ESHOO, M.W.; IVY, C.; ECKER, J.A.; LIBBY, B.; SAMANT, V.; SANNES- LOWERY, K.A.; MELTON, R.E., "Rapid identification and strain-typing of respiratory pathogens for epidemic surveillance", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 8012 - 8017 | - ZAMMATTEO, N.; HAMELS, S.; DE LONGUEVILLE, F.; ALEXANDRE, L; GALA, J.L.; BRASSEUR, F.; REMACLE, J., "New chips for molecular biology and diagnostics", BIOTECHNOL ANNU REV, (2002), vol. 8, pages 85 - 101, XP009001667 | - CAMPBELL, C.J.; GHAZAL, P., "Molecular signatures for diagnosis of infection: application of microarray technology", J APPL MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2672.2003.02112.x, pages 18 - 23, XP002458495 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.2003.02112.x | - BRIESE, T.; PALACIOS, G.; KOKORIS, M.; JABADO, 0.; LIU, Z.; RENWICK, N.; KAPOOR, V.; CASAS, 1.; POZO, F; LIMBERGER, R ET AL., "Diagnostic system for rapid and sensitive differential detection of pathogens", EMERG INFECT DIS, (2005), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.3201/eid1102.040492, pages 310 - 313, XP055137346 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3201/eid1102.040492 | - HACIA, J.G., "Resequencing and mutational analysis using oligonucleotide microarrays", NAT GENET, (1999), vol. 21, pages 42 - 47 | - KOZAL, M.J.; SHAH, N.; SHEN, N.; YANG, R.; FUCINI, R.; MERIGAN, T.C.; RICHMAN, D.D.; MORRIS, D.; HUBBELL, E.; CHEE, M. ET AL., "Extensive polymorphisms observed in HIV-1 clade B protease gene using high- density oligonucleotide arrays", NAT MED, (1996), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nm0796-753, pages 753 - 759, XP002936062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0796-753 | - CUTLER, D.J.; ZWICK, M.E.; CARRASQUILLO, M.M.; YOHN, C.T.; TOBIN, K.P.; KASHUK, C.; MATHEWS, D.J.; SHAH, N.A.; EICHLER, E.E.; WARR, "High-throughput variation detection and genotyping using microarrays", GENOME RES, (2001), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1101/gr.197201, pages 1913 - 1925, XP008154971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.197201 | - GINGERAS, T.R.; GHANDOUR, G.; WANG, E.; BERNO, A.; SMALL, P.M.; DROBNIEWSKI, F.; ALLAND, D.; DESMOND, E.; HOLODNIY, M.; DRENKOW, J, "Simultaneous genotyping and species identification using hybridization pattern recognition analysis of generic Mycobacterium DNA arrays", GENOME RES, (1998), vol. 8, pages 435 - 448, XP002156298 | - LIN, B.; VAHEY, M.T.; THACH, D.; STENGER, D.A.; PANCRAZIO, J.J., "Biological threat detection via host gene expression profiling", CLIN CHERN, (2003), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1373/49.7.1045, pages 1045 - 1049, XP002458496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/49.7.1045 | - WILSON, W.J.; STROUT, C.L.; DESANTIS, T.Z.; STILWELL, J.L.; CARRANO, A.V.; ANDERSEN, G.L., "Sequence-specific identification of 18 pathogenic microorganisms using microarray technology", MOL CELL PROBES, (2002), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1006/mcpr.2001.0397, pages 119 - 127, XP004466435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.2001.0397 | - WILSON, K.H.; WILSON, W.J.; RADOSEVICH, J.L.; DESANTIS, T.Z.; VISWANATHAN, V.S.; KUCZMARSKI, T.A.; ANDERSEN, G.L., "High-density microarray of small-subunit ribosornal DNA probes", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2002), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.68.5.2535-2541.2002, pages 2535 - 2541, XP002289520 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.68.5.2535-2541.2002 | - ZWICK, M.E.; MCAFEE, F.; CUTLER, D.J.; READ, T.D.; RAVEL, J.; BOWMAN, G.R.; GALLOWAY, D.R.; MATECZUN, A., "Microarray-based resequencing of multiple Bacillus anthracis isolates.", GENOME BIOL, (2005), vol. 6, page 10 | - WONG, C.W.; ALBERT, T.J.; VEGA, V.B.; NORTON, J.E.; CUTLER, D.J.; RICHMOND, T.A.; STANTON, L.W.; LIU, E.T.; MILLER, L.D., "Tracking the evolution of the SARS coronavirus using high-throughput, high- density resequencing arrays", GENOME RES, (2004), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1101/gr.2141004, pages 398 - 405, XP008154970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.2141004 | - SULAIMAN, I.M.; LIU, X.; FRACE, M.; SULAIMAN, N.; OLSEN-RASMUSSEN, M.; NEUHAUS, E.; ROTA, P.A.; WOHLHUETER, RM., "Evaluation of affymetrix severe acute respiratory syndrome resequencing GeneChips in characterization of the genomes of two strains of coronavirus infecting humans", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2006), vol. 72, pages 207 - 211 | - WANG, Z.; DAUM, L.T.; VORA, G.J.; METZGAR, D.; WALTER, E.A.; CANAS, L.C.; MALANOSKI, A.P.; LIN, B.; STENGER, D.A., "Identifying Influenza Viruses with Resequencing Microarrays", EMERG INFECT DIS, (2006), vol. 12, pages 638 - 646, XP009131642 | - LIN, B.; WANG, Z.; VORA, G.J.; THORNTON, J.A.; SCHNUR, J.M.; THACH, D.C.; BLANEY, K.M.; LIGLER, A.G.; MALANOSKI, A.P.; SANTIAGO, J, "Broad-spectrum respiratory tract pathogen identification using resequencing DNA microarrays", GENOME RES., (2006), vol. 16, pages 527 - 535 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F.; GISH, W.; MILLER, W.; MYERS, E.W.; LIPMAN, D.J., "Basic local alignment search tooL", J MOL BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999 | - DAVIGNON, L.; WALTER, E.A.; MUELLER, K.M.; BARROZO, C.P.; STENGER, D.A.; LIN, B., "Use of resequencing oligonucleotide microarrays for identification of Streptococcus pyogenes and associated antibiotic resistance determinants.", J CLIN MICROBIOL, (2005), vol. 43, pages 5690 - 5695 |