EP2695959 - Method for the Production of an Aluminum Alloy Sheet that Exhibits Excellent Surface Quality After Anodizing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | Aluminum alloy sheet that exhibits excellent surface quality after anodizing and method for producing the same | ||
[2015/22] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2018/34] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 11-3, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asano, Mineo c/o Sumitomo Light Metal Industries, LTD. 11-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8601 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Yusuke c/o Sumitomo Light Metal Industries, LTD. 11-3, Shinbashi 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8601 / JP | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2016/32] |
Former [2014/07] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 13003172.7 | 21.06.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | JP20120175697 | 08.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012175697 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695959 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2695959 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2695959 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/06, C22F1/047 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
C22C21/08 (EP,KR,US);
C22C21/06 (EP,KR,US);
B21B1/26 (US);
B21B1/40 (KR);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C22F1/047 (EP,US);
C25D11/04 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2014/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aluminium-Legierungsblech, das nach Anodisierung eine hervorragende Oberflächenqualität aufweist, und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | [2023/25] | English: | Method for the Production of an Aluminum Alloy Sheet that Exhibits Excellent Surface Quality After Anodizing | [2015/22] | French: | Feuille d'alliage d'aluminium présentant une excellente qualité de surface après anodisation et son procédé de production | [2023/25] |
Former [2014/07] | Aluminium-Legierungsblech, das nach Anodisierung eine hervorragende Oberflächenqualität aufweist, und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | ||
Former [2014/07] | Aluminum alloy sheet that exhibits excellent surface quality after anodizing and method for producing the same | ||
Former [2014/07] | Feuille d'alliage d'aluminium présentant une excellente qualité de surface après anodisation et son procédé de production | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.11.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 08.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2015 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 22.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2017
12.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE C-Tec Constellium Technology Center / Constellium Rolled Products Singen GmbH CS10027 - Propriété Industrielle 725, rue Aristide Bergès Alusingen-Platz 1 38341 Voreppe / 78224 Singen / FR | [2017/25] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 20.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.12.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.06.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.12.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 13.02.2019 | Appeal received No. T0436/19 | 23.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.12.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 14.02.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 01.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2013 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | GB | 21.06.2017 | IE | 21.06.2017 | LU | 21.06.2017 | MT | 21.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.06.2017 | ||
LU | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.06.2017 | ||
LU | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.06.2017 | ||
LU | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.06.2017 | ||
LU | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 21.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.06.2017 | ||
LU | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 21.06.2017 | ||
LU | 21.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2006052436 (FURUKAWA SKY KK) [AD] 1-3* abstract *; | [E]EP2653577 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND [JP]) [E] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] - [0009] - [0012] , [0015] , [0019] , [0029] , [0035]; tables 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2000273563 | JP2006052436 | Opposition | US3164494 | JPS5811769 | JP2009209426 | EP2862952 |