EP2814084 - Secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakajima, Junji 1-5-10-1605, Abeno-suji Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-0052 / JP | For all designated states Fujiwara, Yoshimasa 2-9-1-1017, Higashinakaburi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0093 / JP | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Greenful New Energy Co., Ltd. 28-227, 26 Jiang Chan San Lu Zha Bei Qu Shanghai / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mengqun, Si Hong Mei Road Lane 3001 88-20 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
Nakajima, Junji 1-5-10-1605, Abeno-suji Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0052 / JP | [2015/18] |
Former [2014/51] | 01 /
Mengqun, Si Hong Mei Road Lane 3001 88-20 Shanghai / CN | ||
02 /
Ying, Zhou Long Ming Road Lane 2121 18-501 Shanghai / CN | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13003238.6 | 25.06.2013 | [2014/51] | Priority number, date | CN20131234957 | 14.06.2013 Original published format: CN201310234957 | [2014/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814084 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M4/58, H01M10/0525, // H01M4/485, H01M4/587 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H01M4/13 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/409 (KR);
H01M50/446 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/622 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/38 (US);
H01M4/505 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/583 (US);
H01M50/42 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (KR);
H01M50/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2014/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sekundärbatterie | [2014/51] | English: | Secondary battery | [2014/51] | French: | Batterie secondaire | [2014/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 24.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004005265 (CHIANG YET-MING [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0093] , [0094] , [0098] , [0100] - [0104] - [0145] - [0171] * * claims 1,25,26,28,156 *; | [X]WO2009026467 (A123 SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0070] * * claim - *; | [X]US2009291367 (MIZUNO FUMINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] - [0030] - [0033] - [0 41] - [0044] * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]US2009325064 (CHANG YOUNG-CHURL [KR]) [X] 1,6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] - [0032] - [0047] - [0 54] , [0 56] - [0067] - [0 78] - [0081] * * claim - *; | [XI]US2011239446 (MORISHIMA RYUTA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract * * claims 1-6,10 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 32] - [0034] - [0041] - [0048] - [0060] - [0062] - [0064] , [0067] , [0071] - [0080] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 3,5-10; | [X] - MIN KIM ET AL, "Electrochemical performances of inorganic membrane coated electrodes for Li-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF SOLID STATE ELECTROCHEMISTRY ; CURRENT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090505), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 1433-0768, pages 769 - 773, XP019762811 [X] 1,8 * abstract * * sections "Experimental" and "Conclusions" * | [A] - TUKAMOTO H ET AL, "Electronic Conductivity of LiCoO2 and Its Enhancement by Magnesium Doping", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE; US, (19970901), vol. 144, no. 9, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 3164 - 3168, XP002962950 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * sections "Experimental" and "Conclusions" * * page 3164, column 2, line 22 - page 3165, column 2, line 41 * * table 1 * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - HUNGRU CHEN ET AL, "Charge disproportionation and Jahn-Teller distortion in LiNiO_{2} and NaNiO_{2}: A density functional theory study", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, (20110801), vol. 84, no. 8, doi:10.1103/PhysRevB.84.085108, ISSN 1098-0121, page 085108, XP055115613 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * section "IV. Conclusions" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevB.84.085108 | [A] - PING CUI ET AL, "Preparation and characteristics of Sb-doped LiNiO2 cathode materials for Li-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF SOLIDS, PERGAMON PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 72, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.JPCS.2011.04.013, ISSN 0022-3697, (20110422), pages 899 - 903, (20110429), XP028095128 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * section "2. Experimental" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpcs.2011.04.013 | by applicant | JPH05242911 |