EP2818607 - Composite wood board with an indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. SmartCity Malta SCM01 Office 406 Ricasoli Kalkara SCM 1001 / MT | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta PTA 9044 / MT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalwa, Norbert Birkenweg 18a 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | 02 /
Güßloff, Jens Kloster 41 17213 Malchow / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2015/01] | 01 /
Kalwa, Norbert Birkenweg 18a 32805 Horn-Bad Melnberg / DE | ||
02 /
Güßloff, Jens Kloster 41 17213 Malchow / DE | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2015/01] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 13003272.5 | 27.06.2013 | [2015/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2818607 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2818607 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/16, G01B7/16, G01N31/22 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
E04C2/16 (EP);
G01N31/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2015/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Holzwerkstoffplatte mit Indikator | [2015/01] | English: | Composite wood board with an indicator | [2015/01] | French: | Plaque en matériau dérivé du bois avec indicateur | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 14.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2013 | AL | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | MT | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IE | 27.06.2017 | LU | 27.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.06.2013 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.06.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.06.2013 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.06.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.06.2013 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.06.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 27.06.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 27.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 01.03.2017 | |
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE10128807 (OESTE FRANZ DIETRICH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 4] - [0008] - [0 18] , [0 24] - [0026] * [Y] 5-7,10-15 [I] 3,4; | [A]US4175207 (ELLIOTT STANLEY B [US]) [A] 3,4 * column 3, lines 10-15 * * column 6, line 42 - column 9, line 13 *; | [Y]US4304135 (PETERSON MARVIN L, et al) [Y] 6 * column 1, lines 5-9 * * column 5, lines 30-52 *; | [Y]US4421719 (BURLEIGH MALCOLM B [US]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 3 - column 6, line 37 *; | [Y]EP2452829 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT], et al) [Y] 10-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002]; claims 1, 9, 15 *; | [Y]EP2537653 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [Y] 10-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 22]; figure 2 * | [Y] - GOGATEC GMBH, "GOGAMARK SIGNS TMS", (20130101), URL: http://www.gogatec.com/picts/pdfs/KENN/TMS.pdf, (20130124), XP002719235 [Y] 5 * page 23 - page 24 * | by applicant | DE20103745U | DE69303368T | EP1975609 | DE10008166 |