EP2695747 - Method for assembling a caster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AS Rollen GmbH Industriestrasse 47a 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Döpp, Ludger Rechtsanwälte Stahm - Döpp Schulstrasse 52 58332 Schwelm / DE | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 13003916.7 | 06.08.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | DE20121015890 | 10.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012015890 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695747 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00, B60B33/06 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
B60B33/00 (EP);
B60B33/06 (EP);
B60B2200/20 (EP);
B60B2310/302 (EP);
B60B2310/3025 (EP);
B60B2310/306 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Montage einer Laufrolle | [2014/07] | English: | Method for assembling a caster | [2014/07] | French: | Procédé de montage d'une roulette | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 10.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012084940 (TSAI PO-CHUAN [TW]) [I] 7,10,11 * paragraph [[0020]]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]US6588059 (MCCORD ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102009009028 (MANNERIN KONEPAJA AB OY [FI]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [[0024]]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005005394 (ADAM ALON [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE202010012904U | WO2010007293 |