EP2843276 - Rotary valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netzel, Thomas Auf dem Brink 51 21509 Glinde / DE | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004234.4 | 28.08.2013 | [2015/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843276 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2843276 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/085, A61M16/10, A61M16/20 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
F16K11/0856 (EP);
A61M16/107 (EP);
A61M16/204 (EP);
A61M16/205 (EP);
A61M16/0069 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | F16K11/085 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2015/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rotationsventil | [2015/10] | English: | Rotary valve | [2015/10] | French: | Vanne rotative | [2015/10] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 09.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | IE | 28.08.2016 | LU | 28.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 28.08.2016 | ||
LU | 28.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4702240 (CHAOUI SAMIR M [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8601583 (MESROC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011071390 (LIU YUNXING [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10247406 |