EP2738481 - Probe body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jansen AG Industriestrasse 34 9463 Oberriet / CH | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brülisauer, Urs Alviertrasse 25a 9463 Oberriet / CH | 02 /
Eggert, Dominik Käferholtstrasse 238 8046 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Spörri, Robert Oerlikonerstrasse 54b 8057 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Werner, Uwe Finsterseehalde 8825 Hütten / CH | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Fechner, Thomas, et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 50 6830 Rankweil / AT | Application number, filing date | 13005331.7 | 12.11.2013 | [2014/23] | Priority number, date | AT20120001257 | 29.11.2012 Original published format: AT 12572012 | [2014/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2738481 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2738481 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/08 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
F24T10/15 (EP);
Y02E10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sondenkörper | [2014/23] | English: | Probe body | [2014/23] | French: | Corps de sonde | [2014/23] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004031585 (JOHNSON HOWARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * figures 7a-7d, 8a, 8b, 13,16a, * [I] 4,7,8; | [XY]EP2312237 (UNISTAR EUROP [FR]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * figures 3, 5,9 * [Y] 4-8; | [Y]EP2056040 (BRODER AG [CH]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0024]; figure 3 *; | [Y]DE10236238 (KLUGE DIETMAR [DE]) [Y] 4,8 * abstract *; | [X]EP0582118 (SACAC HERGISWIL AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * figures 2,25 *; | [X]US2008016894 (WIGGS B R [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * figure 5 *; | [X]JP2003055964 (NARA YASUNORI) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP2444345 (F B BALZANELLI AVVOLGITORI S P A [IT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |