EP2743041 - Gripper for food servings with flexible flat element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weber Maschinenbau GmbH Breidenbach Günther-Weber-Strasse 3 35236 Breidenbach / DE | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terruli, David Ockershäuser Allee 6a 35037 Marburg / DE | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13005375.4 | 14.11.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | DE20121024833 | 17.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012024833 | [2014/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2743041 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25J11/00, B25J15/00 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
B25J11/0045 (EP);
B25J15/0014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Greifer für Lebensmittelportionen mit flexiblem Flächenelement | [2014/25] | English: | Gripper for food servings with flexible flat element | [2014/25] | French: | Préhenseur pour des portions de produits alimentaires doté d'un élément de surface flexible | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 10.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2551222 (VENDEE CONCEPT [FR]) [XP] 1,2,7,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0066] *; | [A]EP1935788 (MONENTE PLOESSER FRANCISCO [ES]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0030] *; | [A]EP2394936 (MULTIVAC HAGGENMUELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2168892 (OVERVELD MACHINES B V [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]WO2007093774 (AEW DELFORD SYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2407552 (AEW DELFORD GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2039632 | WO2007093774 | EP2036841 | US2010133862 |