EP2744185 - File management system, method and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Information & Telecommunication Engineering, Ltd. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 220-6122 / JP | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyama, Toshiaki c/o: Hitachi Information & Telecommunication Engineering, Ltd. 456, Sakai, Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa, 259-0157 / JP | 02 /
Yamagishi, Toyoki c/o: Hitachi Information & Telecommunication Engineering, Ltd. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 220-6122 / JP | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 13005777.1 | 11.12.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | JP20120271415 | 12.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012271415 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744185 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04L12/18 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H04L12/1831 (EP,US);
H04M1/656 (US);
H04M3/42221 (EP);
H04M2203/301 (EP);
H04M2203/558 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | 25.03.2014 | ME | 25.03.2014 | Title | German: | Dateiverwaltungssystem, Verfahren und Computerprogramm | [2014/25] | English: | File management system, method and computer program | [2014/25] | French: | Système, procédé et programme informatique de gestion de fichiers | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 26.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002035616 (DIAMOND DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1-11* paragraphs [0032] - [0048] - [ 162] - [0185]; figures 1, 14-16 *; | [YD]JP2010219734 (HARDIS SYSTEM DESIGN CO LTD) [YD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0025] - [0043]; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2010219734 |