EP2827385 - Radiation resistant inverted metamorphic multijunction solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SolAero Technologies Corp. 10420 Research Road SE Albuquerque, NM 87123 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Emcore Solar Power, Inc. 10420 Research Road SE Albuquerque NM 87123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Pravin 1901 Busher Street SE Albuquerque, NM 87123 / US | 02 /
Cho, Benjamin 2701 Palo Verde Drive NE Albuquerque, NM 87112 / US | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner GmbB Tauentzienstraße 7 b/c 10789 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Wimmer, Hubert WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13020121.3 | 24.10.2013 | [2015/04] | Priority number, date | US201313941936 | 15.07.2013 Original published format: US201313941936 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2827385 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0687, G01R31/26 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H01L31/06875 (EP,CN,RU);
B64G1/443 (EP);
H01L31/041 (EP);
H01L31/0725 (CN);
H01L31/0735 (CN);
Y02E10/544 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2015/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Strahlungsresistente umgekehrte metamorphische Multiverbindungssolarzelle | [2015/04] | English: | Radiation resistant inverted metamorphic multijunction solar cell | [2015/04] | French: | Cellule solaire multi-jonctions métamorphique inversée résistant aux rayonnements | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/16] | 09.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2018 | 22.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PATEL P ET AL, "Experimental Results From Performance Improvement and Radiation Hardening of Inverted Metamorphic Multijunction Solar Cells", IEEE JOURNAL OF PHOTOVOLTAICS, I E E E, US, (20120618), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1109/JPHOTOV.2012.2198048, ISSN 2156-3381, pages 377 - 381, XP011448103 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 381, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPHOTOV.2012.2198048 | [A] - DANIEL C LAW ET AL, "Recent progress of Spectrolab high-efficiency space solar cells", PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE (PVSC), 2012 38TH IEEE, IEEE, (20120603), doi:10.1109/PVSC.2012.6318246, ISBN 978-1-4673-0064-3, pages 3146 - 3149, XP032258463 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.2012.6318246 | [A] - AKHIL MEHROTRA ET AL, "Superior radiation and dislocation tolerance of IMM space solar cells", PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE (PVSC), 2012 38TH IEEE, IEEE, (20120603), doi:10.1109/PVSC.2012.6318247, ISBN 978-1-4673-0064-3, pages 3150 - 3154, XP032258464 [A] 1-4,6,9-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.2012.6318247 | [A] - TAKAMOTO T ET AL, "Multijunction solar cell technologies - high efficiency, radiation resistance, and concentrator applications", WCPEC-3, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, WCPEC3 ORGANIZING COMMITTEE, (20030511), ISBN 4-9901816-0-3, pages 581 - 586, XP040509761 [A] 1-3,9,11,12 * the whole document * | [A] - MEUSEL M ET AL, "Characterization of monolithic III-V multi-junction solar cells-challenges and application", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 90, no. 18-19, doi:10.1016/J.SOLMAT.2006.06.025, ISSN 0927-0248, (20061123), pages 3268 - 3275, (20061123), XP028002306 [A] 1-3,9,11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solmat.2006.06.025 | by applicant | US2010122724 | - M. YAMAGUCHI, "Radiation Resistance of Compound Semiconductor Solar Cells", J. APPL. PHYS., (1995), vol. 78, doi:doi:10.1063/1.360236, pages 1476 - 1480, XP000541823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.360236 |