EP2617665 - Bead feeding method and bead feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. Warsztatowa 19A 26-600 Radom / PL | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cieslikowski, Bartosz Warsztatowa 19A 26-600 Radom / PL | 02 /
Figarski, Jacek Warsztatowa 19A 26-600 Radom / PL | 03 /
Figarski, Radoslaw Warsztatowa 19A 26-600 Radom / PL | 04 /
Makosa, Kazimierz Warsztatowa 19A 26-600 Radom / PL | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Markieta, Jaroslaw Franciszek Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych J. Markieta, M. Zielinska-Lazarowicz Sp. p. Bukowinska 2 lok 160 02-703 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Markieta, Jaroslaw Franciszek Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych J. Markieta, M. Zielinska-Lazarowicz Sp. p. Wankowicza 5A lok. 23 02-796 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 13150096.9 | 03.01.2013 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | PL20120397840 | 18.01.2012 Original published format: PL 39784012 | [2013/30] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2617665 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2617665 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617665 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/14, A24D3/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
A24D3/0216 (EP,RU,US);
B65G37/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2013/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kügelchenzuführungsverfahren und Kügelchenzuführungsvorrichtung | [2013/30] | English: | Bead feeding method and bead feeder | [2013/30] | French: | Procédé d'alimentation de perles et chargeur de perles | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005070409 (DEAL PHILIP ANDREW [US]) [X] 1,7,9,15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] *; | [X]US2009166376 (GARTHAFFNER MARTIN T [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,11,12,15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X]US2011162662 (NIKOLOV BOGDAN [BG], et al) [X] 1,7* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * | by applicant | WO2009071271 | WO2009071272 | US7833146 | US7975877 |