EP2578796 - Expandable centralizer for expandable pipe string [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frank's International, Inc. 10260 Westheimer Road, Suite 700 Houston, TX 77042 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Frank's International, Inc. 10260 Westheimer Road Suite 700 Houston, TX 77042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buytaert, Jean 7541 FM 1195 Mineral Wells, TX Texas 76067 / US | 02 /
Miller, Eugene Edward 103 Oak Ridge Terrace Weatherford, TX Texas 76086 / US | 03 /
McDowell, Donald Elwin P.O. Box 461 Millsap, TX Texas 76066 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Dowling, Andrew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/15] | Application number, filing date | 13150396.3 | 09.05.2008 | [2013/15] | Priority number, date | US20070749544 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: US 749544 | US20070828943 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 828943 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2578796 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2578796 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/10, E21B43/10 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
E21B17/1028 (EP);
E21B17/1078 (EP);
E21B43/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | Zentrierkorb für erweiterbare Bohrlochrohre | [2013/15] | English: | Expandable centralizer for expandable pipe string | [2013/15] | French: | Elément de centrage expansible destiné à une colonne de tubes dilatables | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08769366.9 / EP2158379 | EP11189762.5 / EP2428637 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2013 | 31.05.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2718266 (BERRY JOHN R, et al) [A] 1-14* figure 4 *; | [A]US3356147 (WILFRED DREYFUSS) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 51-56; figure 4 *; | [A]US3566965 (SOLUM JAMES R) [A] 1-14 * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2148985 (BAKER OIL TOOLS INC) [A] 1-14 * page 3, lines 96-111; figure 1 * | by applicant | US20070749544 | US20070828943 |